blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0650571

EP0650571 - METHOD OF OPERATING AN INTEGRATED LOW NOX TANGENTIAL FIRING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/18]INTEGRATED LOW NO x? TANGENTIAL FIRING SYSTEM
[1998/12]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.01.1999
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMBUSTION ENGINEERING, INC.
1000 Prospect Hill Road Windsor
Connecticut 06095 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/18]For all designated states
COMBUSTION ENGINEERING, INC.
1000 Prospect Hill Road
Windsor, Connecticut 06095 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RINI, Michael, J.
515 Old Slocum Road
Hebron, CT 06248 / US
02 / ELLEWELL, Todd, D.
30 Holly Circle
Windsor, CT 06095 / US
03 / TOWLE, David, P.
6 Meadowbrook Road
Simsbury, CT 06070 / US
04 / JENNINGS, Patrick, L.
Main Road
Granville, MA 01034 / US
05 / LaFLESH, Richard, C.
1678 Hill Street
Suffield, CT 06078 / US
06 / ANDERSON, David, K.
25 Mapleshade Avenue
East Longmeadow, MA 01028 / US
[1995/18]
Representative(s)Miller, Toivo
ABB Patent GmbH
Postfach 1140
68520 Ladenburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/43]Miller, Toivo
ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51
68128 Mannheim / DE
Former [1995/18]Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al
c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51
D-68128 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date94923143.517.03.1994
[1995/18]
WO1994US02827
Priority number, dateUS1993006263413.05.1993         Original published format: US 62634
[1995/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9427086
Date:24.11.1994
Language:EN
[1994/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0650571
Date:03.05.1995
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1995/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0650571
Date:18.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.11.1994
ClassificationIPC:F23C5/32, F23C6/04, F23D1/00
[1995/18]
CPC:
F23C5/32 (EP,US); F23C6/047 (EP,US); F23D1/00 (EP,US);
F23C2201/101 (EP,US); F23D2201/101 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/18]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES INTEGRIERTEN TANGENTIAL-FEUERUNGSSYSTEMS MIT NIEDRIGEM NOX-GEHALT[1998/12]
English:METHOD OF OPERATING AN INTEGRATED LOW NOX TANGENTIAL FIRING SYSTEM[1998/12]
French:PROCEDE D'OPERATION D'UN SYSTEME DE CHAUFFAGE INTEGRE, TANGENTIEL A FAIBLE TENEUR EN NOX[1998/12]
Former [1995/18]INTEGRIERTES TANGENTIAL-FEUERUNGSSYSTEM MIT NIEDRIGEM NOX-GEHALT
Former [1995/18]INTEGRATED LOW NO x? TANGENTIAL FIRING SYSTEM
Former [1995/18]SYSTEME DE CHAUFFAGE INTEGRE, TANGENTIEL A FAIBLE TENEUR EN NO x?
Entry into regional phase13.01.1995National basic fee paid 
13.01.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.12.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.01.1995Examination requested  [1995/18]
06.09.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.01.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.08.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.1997Fee for grant paid
24.10.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.12.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
07.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.03.1998
BE18.03.1998
CH18.03.1998
FR18.03.1998
LI18.03.1998
NL18.03.1998
SE18.06.1998
[2006/14]
Former [2003/08]AT18.03.1998
BE18.03.1998
CH18.03.1998
LI18.03.1998
NL18.03.1998
SE18.06.1998
FR14.08.1998
Former [2000/17]AT18.03.1998
BE18.03.1998
CH18.03.1998
LI18.03.1998
SE18.06.1998
FR14.08.1998
Former [1998/52]AT18.03.1998
BE18.03.1998
SE18.06.1998
FR14.08.1998
Former [1998/49]AT18.03.1998
BE18.03.1998
SE18.06.1998
Former [1998/43]AT18.03.1998
SE18.06.1998
Former [1998/40]AT18.03.1998
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0129001  (COMBUSTION ENG [US]) [A] 25 * page 9, line 14 - page 10, line 23; figures 4-6 *;
 [A]US4504211  (BEARDMORE DAVID H [US]) [A] 16 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 42 * * column 4, line 50 - column 4, line 66 * * figure 1 *;
 [AD]US5020454  (HELLEWELL TODD D [US], et al) [AD] 1,2,8-11 * column 9, line 47 - column 10, line 66 * * column 11, line 25 - column 12, line 37 * * column 12, line 62 - column 13, line 27 * * column 14, line 31 - column 14, line 40 * * figures 1,2,5,6 *;
 [A]GB2240619  (LINTEC ENGINEERING [ZA]) [A] 25 * page 4, line 13 - page 4, line 25; figure 2 *;
 [AD]US5146858  (TOKUDA KIMISHIRO [JP], et al) [AD] 1 * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 17 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [AD]US5195450  (MARION JOHN L [US])
by applicantUS4504211
 US5195450
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.