Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0708835

EP0708835 - FRUIT SPECIFIC PROMOTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 18.04.2007  [2007/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Monsanto Technology LLC
800 North Lindbergh Boulevard
St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US
[2001/29]
Former [1996/18]For all designated states
MONSANTO COMPANY
800 North Lindbergh Boulevard
St. Louis Missouri 63167 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CONNER, Timothy, Wilkes
504 Trails of Sunbrook
St. Charles, MO 63301 / US
[1996/18]
Representative(s)Bosch, Henry , et al
Monsanto Europe S.A./N.V. Avenue de Tervuren 270-272
1150 Brussels / BE
[N/P]
Former [1998/33]Bosch, Henry , et al
Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270/272 Letter Box No. 1
1150 Brussels / BE
Former [1996/18]Nash, Brian Walter , et al
Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department, Avenue de Tervuren 270/272, Letter Box No. 21
B-1150 Bruxelles / BE
Application number, filing date94923227.627.06.1994
[1996/18]
WO1994US07072
Priority number, dateUS1993009052312.07.1993         Original published format: US 90523
[1996/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9502696
Date:26.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0708835
Date:01.05.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.1995
[1996/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0708835
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.01.1995
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/82, C12N15/29, C12N15/54, C12N5/10, A01H5/00
[1996/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/18]
TitleGerman:FRUCHT SPEZIFISCHE PROMOTORE[1996/18]
English:FRUIT SPECIFIC PROMOTERS[1996/18]
French:PROMOTEUR SPECIFIQUES DE FRUITS[1996/18]
Entry into regional phase08.01.1996National basic fee paid 
08.01.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/19]
20.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2002Fee for grant paid
03.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
09.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
DK11.12.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2007/16]
Former [2004/04]GR11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/22]GR11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE11.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9119806  (MONSANTO CO [US]) [DA] 1-13 * page 9, line 9 - line 31 *;
 [A]WO8912386  (CALGENE INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * examples 5,6 *;
 [A]EP0409629  (CALGENE INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 9, column 16, line 3 - line 15 *
 [A]  - SALTS, Y.,ET AL., "DNA sequence of the tomato fruit expressed proline-rich protein gene TPRP-F1 reveals an intron within the 3' untranslated transcript", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 18, pages 407 - 409, [A] 1,2 * the whole document *
 [A]  - WINGATE, V.P.M., ET AL., "Uniquely regulated proteinase inhibitor I gene in a wild tomato species", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1991), vol. 97, pages 496 - 501, [A] 1-3,6,9,10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - VAN HAAREN, M.J.J., ET AL., "Strong negative and positive regulatory elements contribute to the high-level fruit-specific expression of the tomato 2A11 gene", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1991), vol. 17, pages 615 - 613, [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SALTS, Y., ET AL., "Sequence coding for a novel proline-rich protein preferentially expresssed in young tomato fruit", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1991), vol. 17, pages 149 - 150, [A] 1,2 * the whole document *