Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0708627

EP0708627 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROVIDING NICOTINE REPLACEMENT THERAPY TRANSDERMALLY/TRANSBUCCALLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 26.06.2002  [2002/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CYGNUS, INC.
400 Penobscot Drive
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
[1997/10]
Former [1996/41]For all designated states
Cygnus, Inc.
32 Loockerman Square, Suite L-100
City of Dover, County of Kent, Delaware / US
Former [1996/18]For all designated states
CYGNUS THERAPEUTIC SYSTEMS
400 Penobscot Drive
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WONG, Ooi
2236 Gomes Road
Fremont, CA 94536 / US
02 / FARINAS, Kathleen Cogan
2207 16th Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94116 / US
03 / CLEARY, Gary W.
350 Sharon Park Drive
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
04 / CHIANG, Chia-Ming
380 Shad Court
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
05 / XIA, Jun
450 Vera Street 9
Redwood City, CA 94061 / US
[1996/42]
Former [1996/41]01 / WONG, Ooi
2236 Gomes Road
Fremont, CA 94536 / US
02 / FARINAS, Kathleen Cogan
2207 16th Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94116 / US
03 / CLEARY, Gary W.
350 Sharon Park Drive
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
04 / CHIANG, Chia-Ming
380 Shad Court
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
05 / XIA, Jun
450 Vera Street 9
Redwood City, CA 94061 / US
Former [1996/18]01 / WONG, Ooi
2236 Gomes Road
Fremont, CA 94536 / US
02 / FARINAS, Kathleen, Cogan
2207 16th Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94116 / US
03 / CLEARY, Gary, W.
350 Sharon Park Drive
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
04 / CHIANG, Chia-Ming
380 Shad Court
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
05 / XIA, Jun
450 Vera Street 9
Redwood City, CA 94061 / US
Representative(s)Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/45]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [1996/18]Goldin, Douglas Michael , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date94923343.106.07.1994
[1996/18]
WO1994US07574
Priority number, dateUS1993008997109.07.1993         Original published format: US 89971
US1994024752023.05.1994         Original published format: US 247520
[1996/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9501766
Date:19.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0708627
Date:01.05.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.1995
[1996/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0708627
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search reportUS19.01.1995
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP03.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/70, A61K31/465
[1997/13]
Former International [1996/18]A61F13/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/18]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE TRANSDERMALE ODER TRANSBUCCALE THERAPEUTISCHE VERABREICHUNG VON NIKOTINSUBSTITUTEN[1996/18]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROVIDING NICOTINE REPLACEMENT THERAPY TRANSDERMALLY/TRANSBUCCALLY[1996/18]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF THERAPEUTIQUE D'ADMINISTRATION DE SUBSTITUT DE LA NICOTINE PAR VOIE TRANSCUTANEE OU BUCCALE[1996/18]
Entry into regional phase29.01.1996National basic fee paid 
29.01.1996Search fee paid 
29.01.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.02.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
29.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/18]
07.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.1999Fee for grant paid
30.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES02.02.2000
[2002/26]
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US4943435  (BAKER RICHARD W [US], et al);
 [Y]US4877618  (REED JR FRED D [US]);
 [A]US4946853  (BANNON YVONNE B [IE], et al);
 [A]US5004610  (OSBORNE JAMES L [US], et al);
 [A]US5016652  (ROSE JED E [US], et al);
 [A]US5064654  (BERNER BRET [US], et al)