Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0712383

EP0712383 - BITETRAZOLEAMINE GAS GENERANT COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cordant Technologies Inc.
2475 Washington Boulevard Ogden
Utah 84401 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/20]For all designated states
Cordant Technologies Inc.
2475 Washington Boulevard
Ogden Utah 84401 / US
Former [1996/21]For all designated states
THIOKOL CORPORATION
2475 Washington Boulevard
Ogden Utah 84401 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HIGHSMITH, Thomas K.
382 East 3350 North
North Ogden, UT 84414 / US
02 / BLAU, Reed J.
Box 476 75 East Main
Richmond, UT 84333 / US
03 / LUND, Gary K.
1723 Capitol Street
Ogden, UT 84401 / US
[1996/21]
Representative(s)Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/21]Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date94923481.914.07.1994
[1996/21]
WO1994US07912
Priority number, dateUS1993010139602.08.1993         Original published format: US 101396
[1996/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9504015
Date:09.02.1995
Language:EN
[1995/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0712383
Date:22.05.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.1995
[1996/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0712383
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.02.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:C06B45/10, C06B47/08, B60R21/28, C06D5/06
[1996/37]
Former International [1996/21]C06B45/10, C06B47/08, B60R21/28
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL,   SE [1996/21]
TitleGerman:GASERZEUGENDE BITETRAZOLEAMINZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG[1996/21]
English:BITETRAZOLEAMINE GAS GENERANT COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE[1996/21]
French:COMPOSES DE BITETRAZOLEAMINE GENERATEURS DE GAZ ET LEUR MODE D'UTILISATION[1996/21]
Entry into regional phase01.03.1996National basic fee paid 
01.03.1996Search fee paid 
01.03.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
01.03.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.12.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.03.1996Examination requested  [1996/21]
07.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.02.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
01.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.1999Fee for grant paid
21.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Request for further processing for:01.05.1998Request for further processing filed
01.05.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.05.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
IT19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2004/07]BE19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
Former [2003/45]BE19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
Former [2003/08]BE19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
Former [2002/26]BE19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
Former [2001/08]BE19.01.2000
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US4948439  (POOLE DONALD R [US], et al);
 [Y]US3940298  (BECKERT WERNER F, et al);
 [Y]US3845970  (HERRMANN G);
 [Y]US3719604  (PRIOR J, et al);
 [Y]US5035757  (POOLE DONALD R [US]);
 [A]US3909322  (CHANG MARGUERITE S, et al);
 [A]US3912561  (DOIN BERNARD J, et al);
 [A]US5053086  (HENRY RONALD A [US], et al);
 [A]US5198046  (BUCERIUS KLAUS M [US], et al)