blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0686186

EP0686186 - Detergent compositions comprising high active enzyme granulates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/50]HIGH ACTIVE ENZYME GRANULATES
[1998/17]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  22.10.2004
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/50]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FRANCE, Paul, Amaat, R., G.
Patrijzenlaan 36, bus 2
B-3010 Kessl-10 / BE
02 / BAECK, Andre, Cesar
Putsesteenweg 273
D-2820 Bonheiden / BE
03 / VEGA, Jose, Luis
Nieuwelaan 121
B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[1995/50]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/27]TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Former [1995/50]Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al
Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100
B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date94923580.810.02.1994
[1995/50]
WO1994US01528
Priority number, dateEP1993087003526.02.1993         Original published format: EP 93870035
[1995/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9419444
Date:01.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0686186
Date:13.12.1995
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1995/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0686186
Date:22.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.09.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.1995
ClassificationIPC:C11D1/00, C11D17/06, C11D3/386
[1995/50]
CPC:
C11D3/38627 (EP,US); C11D17/065 (EP,US); C11D3/38672 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/33]
Former [1995/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Enzymgranulate hoher Aktivität in Waschmitteln[1998/17]
English:Detergent compositions comprising high active enzyme granulates[1998/17]
French:Compositions détergentes comprenant des granules d'enzymes à grande activité[1998/17]
Former [1995/50]ENZYMGRANULATE HOHER AKTIVITÄT
Former [1995/50]HIGH ACTIVE ENZYME GRANULATES
Former [1995/50]GRANULES D'ENZYME A GRANDE ACTIVITE
Entry into regional phase03.08.1995National basic fee paid 
03.08.1995Search fee paid 
03.08.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
03.08.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.08.1995Examination requested  [1995/50]
15.01.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.07.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.07.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.1997Fee for grant paid
10.09.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.01.1999  04.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
925 Page Mill Rd.
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US
Opponent's representative
Kremer, Simon Mark
Mewburn Ellis LLP
Aurora Building
Counterslip
Bristol BS1 6BX / GB
 02  22.01.1999  04.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
NOVOZYMES A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Wichmann, Hendrik
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
 03  22.01.1999  09.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455 /
Unilever Hse, 100 Victoria Embankment, Blackfriars
3013 AL Rotterdam / London EC4Y 0DY / NL
Opponent's representative
Kan, Jacob Hendrik
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2008/38]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.1999  04.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
925 Page Mill Rd.
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US
Opponent's representative
Kremer, Simon Mark
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
 02  22.01.1999  04.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
NOVOZYMES A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Wichmann, Hendrik
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
 03  22.01.1999  09.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
Kan, Jacob Hendrik
Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Former [2008/32]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.1999  04.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
925 Page Mill Rd.
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US
Opponent's representative
Kremer, Simon Mark
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
 02  22.01.1999  04.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
NOVOZYMES A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Wichmann, Hendrik, Dr.
Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Postfach 86 08 80
81635 München / DE
 03  22.01.1999  09.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
Kan, Jacob Hendrik
Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Former [2003/21]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.1999  04.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
925 Page Mill Rd.
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US
Opponent's representative
Kremer, Simon Mark
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
 02  22.01.1999  04.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
NOVOZYMES A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Wichmann, Hendrik, Dr.
Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Postfach 86 08 80
81635 München / DE
 03  22.01.1999  09.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
NL - 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
Kan, Jacob Hendrik, Dr.
Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137
3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL
Former [2001/20]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.1999  04.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
925 Page Mill Rd.
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US
Opponent's representative
Kremer, Simon Mark
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
 02  22.01.1999  04.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
NOVOZYMES A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Bösl, Raphael, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
 03  22.01.1999  09.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
NL - 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
Kan, Jacob Hendrik, Dr.
Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137
3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL
Former [2000/49]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.1999  04.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
925 Page Mill Rd.
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US
Opponent's representative
Kremer, Simon Mark
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
 02  22.01.1999  04.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Novo Nordisk A/S
Novo Allé
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Bösl, Raphael, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck,Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
 03  22.01.1999  09.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
NL - 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
Kan, Jacob Hendrik, Dr.
Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137
3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL
Former [1999/12]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.1999  04.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
925 Page Mill Rd.
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US
Opponent's representative
Kremer, Simon Mark
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
 02  22.01.1999  04.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Novo Nordisk A/S
Novo Allé
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Dehmel, Albrecht, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler-Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
 03  22.01.1999  09.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
NL - 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
Kan, Jacob Hendrik, Dr.
Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137
3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL
Former [1999/11]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.1999    ADMISSIBLE
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
925 Page Mill Rd.
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US
Opponent's representative
Kremer, Simon Mark
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
 02  22.01.1999   
Novo Nordisk A/S
Novo Allé
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Dehmel, Albrecht, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler-Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
25.05.1999Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.01.2000Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.05.2001Date of oral proceedings
21.06.2001Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.06.2001Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
12.08.2004Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/50]
Appeal following opposition14.08.2001Appeal received No.  T0942/01
26.10.2001Statement of grounds filed
12.08.2004Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
12.08.2004Date of oral proceedings
25.08.2004Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0425277  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * examples 1,8,13-21 *;
 [X]EP0381397  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * examples 1-3 *;
 [X]WO9213054  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1 * example 3 *;
 [X]EP0495257  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-4,7 * page 14 * * examples IV-XI *;
 [X]DE4116701  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * examples 7-12; tables 9-14 *;
 [X]EP0368589  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1 * examples 5,8; claims 4,5 *;
 [A]WO9109941  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1,4,7 * page 6; example - * * page 1 *;
 [A]EP0304332  (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [A] 1,5,6 * example - *
International search[X]US4999138  (NEBASHI TUTOMU [JP], et al);
 [XP]US5259981  (CHAPPLE ANDREW P [GB], et al);
 [X]JPS6369894  (KAO CORP);
 [A]US5178798  (JOLICOEUR JOHN M [US]);
 [Y]US4652391  (BALK MANFRED [FR]);
 [Y]US5009804  (CLAYTON SIMON N [GB], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.