EP0712335 - HYDROCYCLONE SEPARATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL FLUID SEPARATION PTY. LIMITED 27 Tourello Avenue East Hawthorn, VIC 3123 / AU | [1996/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARKE, Neville Unit 4 1 Reserve Street Berwick, VIC 3806 / AU | [1996/21] | Representative(s) | Spall, Christopher John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/21] | Spall, Christopher John BARKER, BRETTELL & DUNCAN 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 94923589.9 | 08.08.1994 | [1996/21] | WO1994AU00456 | Priority number, date | AU1993PM00395 | 06.08.1993 Original published format: AU PM039593 | [1996/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9504602 | Date: | 16.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0712335 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 16.02.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B04C5/04 | [1996/21] | CPC: |
B04C5/13 (EP,US);
B04C5/06 (EP,US);
B04C5/08 (EP,US);
B04C5/103 (EP,US);
B04C5/14 (EP,US);
B04C5/187 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/21] | Extension states | LT | 04.03.1996 | SI | 04.03.1996 | Title | German: | HYDROZYKLONABSCHEIDER | [1996/21] | English: | HYDROCYCLONE SEPARATORS | [1996/21] | French: | SEPARATEURS A HYDROCYCLONE | [1996/21] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.1996 | Search fee paid | 04.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 04.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/21] | 01.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/44] | 03.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/44] | 03.02.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.05.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Appeal following examination | 11.07.2003 | Appeal received No. T0024/04 | 19.09.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.07.2005 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 11.07.2003 | Appeal received | 19.09.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.07.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.07.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.1998 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   09.09.1998 | 31.08.1999 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   12.11.1999 | 31.08.2000 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 31.08.2004 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]AU5992186 (MICROSCIENCE CORP); | [X]AU7087787 (CARROLL NOEL); | [X]AU1883776 (ENSO GUTZEIT OY) |