Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0705202

EP0705202 - DUAL CHAMBER DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  05.09.2003
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
Blackfriars
London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:CH  DE  ES  FR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [1999/51]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:CH  DE  ES  FR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Former [1996/15]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:CH  DE  ES  FR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / IAIA, Mark, John
140 North Lincoln Avenue
Pearl River, NY 10965 / US
02 / MEENAN, Joseph, Edward
640 Washington Avenue
Pleasantville, NY 10570 / US
[1996/15]
Representative(s)Kan, Jacob Hendrik , et al
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Kan, Jacob Hendrik , et al
Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Former [1999/36]Kan, Jacob Hendrik , et al
Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137
3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL
Former [1997/16]Rots, Maria Johanna Francisca , et al
Unilever PLC, Patent Division, Colworth House
Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Former [1996/15]Gordon, Naoise Padhraic Edward , et al
Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook
GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Application number, filing date94924211.923.06.1994
[1996/15]
WO1994EP02065
Priority number, dateUS1993008628701.07.1993         Original published format: US 86287
[1996/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9501287
Date:12.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0705202
Date:10.04.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.1995
[1996/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0705202
Date:22.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.01.1995
ClassificationInternational:B65D35/22, B65D81/32
[1996/15]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/15]
TitleGerman:ZWEIKAMMER-SPENDER[1996/15]
English:DUAL CHAMBER DISPENSER[1996/15]
French:DISTRIBUTEUR A DEUX COMPARTIMENTS[1996/15]
Entry into regional phase04.11.1995National basic fee paid 
04.11.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.11.1995Examination requested  [1996/15]
31.08.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.01.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.1999Fee for grant paid
26.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.09.2000  04.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH
Zerninstrasse 10-18
D-64297 Darmstadt / DE
 [2003/13]
Former [2000/48]
Opponent(s)01  21.09.2000  04.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Goldwell GmbH
Im Leuschenpark 2
64347 Griesheim / DE
26.10.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.04.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2002Reply to a communication from the opposition division
14.05.2003Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2003/43]
14.05.2003Date of oral proceedings
26.05.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.05.2003Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
19.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
24.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.199906   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.1999
Cited inInternational search[XA]JPH03162248  (DAIWA CAN) [X] 9 * figure 2 * [A] 1,4;
 [AD]US4687663  (SCHAEFFER) [AD] 1,4 * column 5, line 39 - line 45; figure 2 *;
 [A]US3866800  (SCHMITT) [A] 1 * figures 6-8 *
    [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911008), vol. 15, no. 396, Database accession no. (M - 1166) [ ] * abstract *