Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0719424

EP0719424 - LIGHT MODULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CENTRAL RESEARCH LABORATORIES LIMITED
Dawley Road Hayes
Middlesex, UB3 1HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/27]For all designated states
CENTRAL RESEARCH LABORATORIES LIMITED
Dawley Road
Hayes, Middlesex, UB3 1HH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / LOCKMULLER, Neil Central Research Laboratories
Dawley Road
Hayes Middlesex UB3 1HH / GB
02 / PETTS, Steven Central Research Laboratories
Dawley Road
Hayes Middlesex UB3 1HH / GB
[1996/27]
Representative(s)Marsh, Robin Geoffrey , et al
QED I.P. Services Limited
Dawley Road
Hayes, Middlesex
UB3 1HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/18]Marsh, Robin Geoffrey , et al
QED I.P. Services Limited, Dawley Road
Hayes, Middlesex, UB3 1HH / GB
Former [1996/27]Marsh, Robin Geoffrey , et al
THORN EMI Patents Limited Central Research Laboratories Dawley Road
Hayes, Middlesex UB3 1HH / GB
Application number, filing date94924963.502.09.1994
[1996/27]
WO1994GB01902
Priority number, dateGB1993001935118.09.1993         Original published format: GB 9319351
[1996/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9508788
Date:30.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0719424
Date:03.07.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.1995
[1996/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0719424
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.03.1995
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/1343
[1996/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1996/27]
TitleGerman:LICHTMODULATOR[1996/27]
English:LIGHT MODULATOR[1996/27]
French:MODULATEUR OPTIQUE[1996/27]
Entry into regional phase19.02.1996National basic fee paid 
19.02.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
19.02.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.03.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/27]
03.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.03.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.1999Fee for grant paid
15.04.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199704   M06   Fee paid on   21.02.1998
01.10.199805   M06   Fee paid on   21.10.1998
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0224040  (STANLEY) [X] 1,4 * page 3, line 5 - line 27; figure 3 *;
 [X]JPH0263019  ;
 [A]JPS60146220  ;
 [A]WO9015360  (HOECHST) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0468452  (HOSIDEN) [A] 1,3 * page 7, paragraph 1; figure 10B *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900524), vol. 14, no. 245, Database accession no. (P - 1052)<4188> , & JP263019 A 19900302 (CANON) [X] 1,3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851214), vol. 9, no. 320, Database accession no. (P - 413), & JP60146220 A 19850801 (MATSUSHITA) [A] 1,3 * abstract *