Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0713523

EP0713523 - CELLULASE FABRIC-CONDITIONING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  08.08.2003
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2003Opposition rejectedpublished on 24.09.2003  [2003/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/22]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SIKLOSI, Michael, Peter
7299 Bobby Lane
Cincinnati, OH 45243 / US
02 / HARTMAN, Frederick, Anthony
10347 Deerfield Road
Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US
03 / HUBESCH, Bruno, Albert, Jean
Van Vlasselaerstraat 16
B-3061 Leefdaal / BE
04 / PLUYTER, Johan, Gerwin
Romeinsesteenweg 522, Bus 3
B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
05 / VENEGAS, Manuel, Garcia
7977 Quail Meadow
West Chester, OH 45069 / US
[1996/22]
Representative(s)Engisch, Gautier
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA
IP Patent Department
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [1996/22]Engisch, Gautier
Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100
B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date94925200.108.08.1994
[1996/22]
WO1994US08893
Priority number, dateUS1993010542212.08.1993         Original published format: US 105422
[1996/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9505442
Date:23.02.1995
Language:EN
[1995/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0713523
Date:29.05.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.1995
[1996/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0713523
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.02.1995
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/00, C11D3/386
[1996/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/06]
Former [1996/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:WÄSCHEWEICHMACHERZUSAMMENTZUNGEN ENTHALTEND ZELLULASE[1996/22]
English:CELLULASE FABRIC-CONDITIONING COMPOSITIONS[1996/22]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE CONDITIONNEMENT DE TISSUS ET CONTENANT UNE CELLULASE[1996/22]
Entry into regional phase03.02.1996National basic fee paid 
03.02.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
03.02.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/23]
07.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.12.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
01.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2000Fee for grant paid
09.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99870253.4   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 20.12.1999
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.03.2001   
HENKEL KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2001/19]
Opponent(s)01  20.03.2001   
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
26.04.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.10.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.04.2003Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2003/39]
02.04.2003Date of oral proceedings
24.04.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.04.2003Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
08.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
04.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO9113136  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [DX] 1-5,8-10 * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 27; example 5; claim - *;
 [A]EP0173397  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0495554  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0239910  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 7 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2258655  (SANDOZ LTD [CH]) [A] 6 * the whole document *;
 [PA]WO9403577  (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [PA] 1 * page 5, paragraph 2 *
 [PXA]  - U. HOTZ, "Verwendung von Cellulasen in Waschmitteln", TENSIDE, MUNCHEN DE, (199312), vol. 30, no. 6, pages 388 - 393, XP000415632 [PX] 1-5 * page 390, paragraph 2 - page 393 * [A] 8-10