Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0712436

EP0712436 - LOW-FOAMING WASHING OR CLEANING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.01.1998
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.01.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.03.1998 [1998/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
[1996/21]
Inventor(s)01 / HEES, Udo
Vulkaneifelstrasse 45
D-56727 Mayen / DE
02 / KIEWERT, Eva
Am Langen Weiher 6
D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE
03 / BEHLER, Ansgar
Siegfriedstrasse 80
D-46240 Bottrop / DE
04 / HAFERKAMP, Astrid
Sperberstrasse 1
D-40789 Monheim / DE
05 / LINK, Kerstin
Rahserstrasse 11
D-41747 Viersen / DE
06 / PASTURA, Amerigo
Sauerbruchstrasse 3a
D-58453 Witten / DE
07 / VOLF, Nada
Wildenbruchstrasse 92
D-40545 Düsselforf / DE
[1996/21]
Application number, filing date94925395.926.07.1994
[1996/21]
WO1994EP02466
Priority number, dateDE1993432611204.08.1993         Original published format: DE 4326112
[1996/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9504803
Date:16.02.1995
Language:DE
[1995/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0712436
Date:22.05.1996
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.1995
[1996/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0712436
Date:19.03.1997
Language:DE
[1997/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.02.1995
ClassificationInternational:C11D1/825, C11D1/83
[1996/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   PT [1996/21]
TitleGerman:SCHWACH SCHÄUMENDE WASCH- ODER REINIGUNGSMITTEL[1996/21]
English:LOW-FOAMING WASHING OR CLEANING AGENTS[1996/21]
French:PRODUITS DE LAVAGE OU DE NETTOYAGE FAIBLEMENT MOUSSANTS[1996/21]
Entry into regional phase30.01.1996National basic fee paid 
30.01.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
30.01.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/21]
30.05.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.09.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.1996Fee for grant paid
11.12.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0408965  (KAO CORPORATION) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * page 3, line 1 - line 11 * * page 4, line 39 - line 40 *;
 [X]EP0105556  (THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * page 3, line 10 * * page 3, line 26 - line 29 * * page 4, line 7 - line 23 * * page 5, line 13 - page 7, line 21 *;
 [DA]WO8809369  (STALEY CONTINENTAL, INC.) [DA] 1-8 * page 4, line 1 - line 27 * * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 19 *;
 [A]WO9114760  (HENKEL KG AA) [A] 1 * page 3, line 1 - page 6, line 21 * * page 7, line 3 - line 20 *