Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0680680

EP0680680 - DYNAMIC RATE ADJUSTMENT FOR OVERLOAD CONTROL IN COMMUNICATION NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 05.11.2008  [2008/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CODEX CORPORATION, a subsidiary company of MOTOROLA INC.
20 Cabot Boulevard
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[1995/45]
Inventor(s)01 / HLUCHYJ, Michael, G.
27 Jackson Road
Wellesley, MA 02181 / US
02 / LEE, Whay, Chiou
Westgate Apartments Nr 401
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
[1995/45]
Representative(s)McCormack, Derek James , et al
Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
[2008/45]
Former [2002/03]McCormack, Derek James , et al
Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link
Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Former [1995/45]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Motorola, European Intellectual Property, Midpoint, Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Application number, filing date94925776.008.08.1994
[1995/45]
WO1994US08933
Priority number, dateUS1993012377320.09.1993         Original published format: US 123773
[1995/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9508882
Date:30.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0680680
Date:08.11.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.1995
[1995/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0680680
Date:16.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.03.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04J3/22, H04Q11/04
[1995/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1995/45]
TitleGerman:DYNAMISCHE RATENANPASSUNG ZUR UEBERLASTREGELUNG IN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERKEN[1995/45]
English:DYNAMIC RATE ADJUSTMENT FOR OVERLOAD CONTROL IN COMMUNICATION NETWORKS[1995/45]
French:REGLAGE DYNAMIQUE DE CAPACITE DESTINE A LA REGULATION DE SURCHARGE DANS DES RESEAUX DE COMMUNICATIONS[1995/45]
Entry into regional phase20.06.1995National basic fee paid 
20.06.1995Search fee paid 
20.06.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/47]
deletedDecision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
02.10.1995Examination requested  [1995/48]
26.04.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
21.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/47]
01.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/15]
29.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2002Fee for grant paid
09.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41]
Request for further processing for:08.11.2000Request for further processing filed
08.11.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.10.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
07.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
07.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL16.10.2002
SE16.01.2003
[2003/30]
Former [2003/27]SE16.01.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]  - COMER D E ET AL, "A RATE-BASED CONGESTION AVOIDANCE AND CONTROL SCHEME FOR PACKET SWITCHED NETWORKS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DISTRIBUTED COMPUTIN SYSTEMS, PARIS, MAY 28 - JUNE 1, 1990, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19900528), no. CONF. 10, pages 390 - 397, XP000166240 [X] 1-11 * page 390, column R, lines 20-19 * * page 392, column L, lines 7-14 * * page 392, column R, lines 5-20 * * page 394, column L, line 47 - page 394, column R, line 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDCS.1990.89307
 [A]  - CROCETTI P ET AL, "BANDWITDH ADVERTISING FOR MAN/ATM CONNECTIONLESS INTERNETTING", NETWORKING IN THE NINETIES, BAL HARBOUR, APR. 7 - 11, 1991, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19910407), VOL. 3, no. CONF. 10, pages 1145 - 1150, XP000223441 [A] 1-11 * page 1146, column R, line 14 - page 1147, column L, line 11 * * page 1147, column L, line 43 - page 1147, column R, line 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.1991.147632
 [A]  - NANYING YIN ET AL, "A DYNAMIC RATE CONTROL MECHANISM FOR INTEGRATED NETWORKS", NETWORKING IN THE NINETIES, BAL HARBOUR, APR. 7 - 11, 1991, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19910407), VOL. 2, no. CONF. 10, pages 543 - 552, XP000223378 [A] 1-11 * page 545, column L, line 1 - page 545, column R, line 5 * * page 546, column L, lines 26-31 *
International search[XY]US5007047  ;
 [Y]US5023869  ;
 [YP]US5276677  ;
 [AP]US5301191  ;
 [A]US3639693