Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0721974

EP0721974 - AQUEOUS DISPERSION OF VINYLIDENE FLUORIDE POLYMER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  25.05.2007
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2007Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect publishedpublished on 27.06.2007  [2007/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED
Umeda Center Building, 4-12 Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu 530 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/29]For all designated states
DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED
Umeda Center Building, 4-12 Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ARAKI, Takayuki Yodogawa-seisakusho
Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi Osaka 566 / JP
02 / TSUDA, Nobuhiko Yodogawa-seisakusho
Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi Osaka 566 / JP
03 / KONDO, Masahiro Yodogawa-seisakusho
Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi Osaka 566 / JP
[1996/29]
Representative(s)Hansen, Bernd , et al
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/29]Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [1997/42]Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [1996/29]Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date94927057.316.09.1994
[1996/29]
WO1994JP01531
Priority number, dateJP1993023385820.09.1993         Original published format: JP 23385893
[1996/29]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9508598
Date:30.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0721974
Date:17.07.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.1995
[1996/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0721974
Date:21.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.03.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:C09D127/16, C08L27/16, C08F2/24, C08F14/22
[1996/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/29]
TitleGerman:WÄSSRIGE DISPERSION VON VINYLIDENFLUORIDPOLYMEREN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[1996/29]
English:AQUEOUS DISPERSION OF VINYLIDENE FLUORIDE POLYMER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME[1996/29]
French:DISPERSION AQUEUSE D'UN POLYMERE DE FLUORURE DE VINYLIDENE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION[1996/29]
Entry into regional phase16.03.1996Translation filed 
16.03.1996National basic fee paid 
16.03.1996Search fee paid 
16.03.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.03.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
16.03.1996Examination requested  [1996/29]
08.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.01.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.1999Fee for grant paid
19.04.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.04.2000  25.01.2007  WITHDRAWN
Dyneon GmbH & Co. KG
Werk Gendorf
D-84504 Burgkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kurz, Arnd
3M ESPE AG
3M Office of Intellectual Property Counsel
ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2007/16]
Opponent(s)01  20.04.2000  25.01.2007  WITHDRAWN
Dyneon GmbH & Co. KG
Werk Gendorf
D-84504 Burgkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kurz, Arnd
3M ESPE AG 3M Office of Intellectual Property Counsel ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
Former [2007/02]
Opponent(s)01  20.04.2000  25.05.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Dyneon GmbH & Co. KG
Werk Gendorf
D-84504 Burgkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kurz, Arnd
3M ESPE AG 3M Office of Intellectual Property Counsel ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
Former [2001/19]
Opponent(s)01  20.04.2000  25.05.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Dyneon GmbH & Co. KG
Werk Gendorf
D-84504 Burgkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Voortmans, Gilbert J.L.
3M Europe S.A., Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
Former [2000/24]
Opponent(s)01  20.04.2000  25.05.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Dyneon GmbH
Werk Gendorf
D-84504 Burgkirchen / DE
30.05.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.10.2000Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.11.2000Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
17.03.2001Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
05.02.2003Date of oral proceedings
03.03.2003Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.03.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.02.2007Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
22.02.2007Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2007/26]
Appeal following opposition29.04.2003Appeal received No.  T0497/03
03.07.2003Statement of grounds filed
08.08.2006Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
08.08.2006Date of oral proceedings
16.08.2006Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US3857827  (DOHANY J) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 21 - line 64 * * column 4, line 14 - line 43 * * column 6, line 7; example 1 *;
 [A]FR1200139  (DUPONT NEMOURS) [A] 1-3 * page 1, column 1, paragraph L - page 2, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, column 1, paragraph 6 - column 2, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]JPS5834814  (DAIKIN) [A] 1-3
    [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 83-33591k [ ] * abstract *
International search[A]JPS638406  ;
 [XA]JPH02222439  ;
 [A]JPS5740866B  ;
 [A]JPS6152842B