Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0721974 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0721974



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 680
25.05.2007 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
22.05.2007 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
14.02.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.02.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.02.2007 Decision to discontinue the opposition proceedings Opposition 2
31.01.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.01.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.2007 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
25.01.2007 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
08.12.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2006 Request for change of representative Opposition 5
17.11.2006 Request for change of representative Opposition 5
21.09.2006 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 18
16.08.2006 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
30.06.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.06.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.06.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.06.2006 Claims Appeal 1
01.06.2006 Claims Appeal 1
01.06.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.04.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.04.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.04.2006 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 1
04.04.2006 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
18.10.2005 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
10.10.2005 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 2
06.05.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.04.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
16.01.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.01.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.01.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
12.01.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.01.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 48
12.01.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
12.01.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.01.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.01.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.01.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
12.01.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.01.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
23.10.2003 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
23.10.2003 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
23.10.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.10.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
09.07.2003 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.07.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 20
13.05.2003 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
12.05.2003 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 2
12.05.2003 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 2
05.05.2003 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.04.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
15.03.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.03.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.03.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.03.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.03.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
03.03.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
03.03.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
03.03.2003 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
03.03.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 8
03.03.2003 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
03.03.2003 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.03.2003 Text intended for grant Opposition 8
27.01.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.01.2003 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
20.01.2003 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
17.12.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.12.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.12.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.12.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
06.12.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
05.12.2002 Claims Opposition 1
05.12.2002 Claims Opposition 1
05.12.2002 Claims Opposition 1
05.12.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
30.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.11.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
27.11.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
07.11.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.11.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.10.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.10.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.10.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
24.10.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
24.10.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
16.10.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.10.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.10.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
28.05.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.04.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.03.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.03.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.03.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
21.03.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.03.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
19.03.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
16.03.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.11.2000 Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.11.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
24.10.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.10.2000 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 19
11.10.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.10.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
02.10.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.05.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
30.05.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.05.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.05.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.05.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.05.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
04.05.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.05.2000 Request for documents Opposition 1
25.04.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
25.04.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 51
25.04.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
25.04.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.04.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.04.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.04.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
25.04.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
25.04.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.04.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
20.04.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
10.06.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
19.04.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.04.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
19.04.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
25.01.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
15.01.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
02.11.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
02.11.1998 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
21.10.1998 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
17.04.1998 Description Search / examination 5
17.04.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
16.02.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Search / examination 1
09.02.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.10.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
26.09.1997 General authorisation Search / examination 1
26.09.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.08.1997 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.08.1997 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.08.1997 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
09.07.1997 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
03.07.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.07.1997 European search report Search / examination 3
03.11.1996 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
03.11.1996 Translation of priority document Search / examination 19
05.06.1996 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
20.05.1996 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
20.05.1996 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
16.03.1996 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.03.1996 Claims Search / examination 1
16.03.1996 Description Search / examination 14
16.03.1996 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
05.01.1996 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
05.01.1996 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
24.05.1995 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
25.04.1995 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
30.03.1995 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
30.03.1995 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 18
30.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 20