Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0676206

EP0676206 - ANTIMALARIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
No. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/41]For all designated states
Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
No. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HAVLIK, Ivan
Medical School of University of the Witwatersrand
7 York Road Parktown Johannesburg / ZA
02 / KANEKO, Yutaro
Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP
03 / MIMURA, Tohru
Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP
04 / CHIHARA, Goro
49-15, Tana-cho Midori-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 227 / JP
[1995/41]
Representative(s)Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/41]Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date94927070.620.09.1994
[1995/41]
WO1994JP01544
Priority number, dateJP1993023329620.09.1993         Original published format: JP 23329693
[1995/41]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9508334
Date:30.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0676206
Date:11.10.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.1995
[1995/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0676206
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.03.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/725, A61K31/72
[1995/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/41]
Former [1995/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:MITTEL GEGEN MALARIA[1995/41]
English:ANTIMALARIAL[1995/41]
French:ANTIPALUDEEN[1995/41]
Entry into regional phase16.05.1995Translation filed 
09.06.1995National basic fee paid 
09.06.1995Search fee paid 
09.06.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.1995Examination requested  [1995/41]
26.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.1999Fee for grant paid
15.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9205790  (EKRE HANS PETER [SE], et al) [X] 1,4 * the whole document * [Y] 1-4;
 [XY]DE1936723  (DER RECH S ER D APPLIC SCIENT) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [Y] 1-4;
 [XY]DE1129148  (EGYT GYOGYSZERVEGYESZETI GYAR) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4;
 [XY]JPS6320141B  ;
 [XY]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 68, no. 00, Database accession no. 66-09413F, & JPS6320141B B2 00000000 (SEIKAGAKU KENKYUSNO) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-4
 [T]  - I. HAVLIK ET AL., "The effect of curdlan sulphate on in vitro growth of Plasmodium falciparum", TRANS. R. SOC. TROP. MED. HYG., (199411), vol. 88, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/0035-9203(94)90230-5, pages 686 - 687, XP023096049 [T] 1-4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0035-9203(94)90230-5
International search[Y]JPS6333333  (RESUKAADEN INC);
 [Y]JPH02229118  (SAPPORO BREWERIES);
 [A]JPH02145601  (AJINOMOTO KK, et al);
 [A]JPH03218317  (JAPAN FOUND CANCER, et al)