Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0721438

EP0721438 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE MATERIAL WITH LAMELLAR INTERPHASE BETWEEN REINFORCING FIBRES AND MATRIX, AND MATERIAL OBTAINED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION "SNECMA"
2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A."
2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
Former [1998/14]For all designated states
SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A."
2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin
F-75015 Paris / FR
Former [1996/29]For all designated states
SOCIETE EUROPEENNE DE PROPULSION
24, rue Salomon de Rothschild
F-92150 Suresnes / FR
Inventor(s)01 / GOUJARD, Stéphane
11, allée Paul-Doumer
F-33700 Mérignac / FR
02 / DUPEL, Pascal
241, rue Emile-Combes
F-33700 Mérignac / FR
03 / PAILLER, René
29, allée de la Lande
F-33610 Cestas / FR
04 / HEURTEVENT, Fabrice
35, rue Quentin
F-33000 Bordeaux / FR
[1996/29]
Representative(s)Joly, Jean-Jacques , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1996/29]Joly, Jean-Jacques , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date94927699.220.09.1994
[1996/29]
WO1994FR01091
Priority number, dateFR1993001143827.09.1993         Original published format: FR 9311438
[1996/29]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9509136
Date:06.04.1995
Language:FR
[1995/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0721438
Date:17.07.1996
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.1995
[1996/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0721438
Date:12.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.04.1995
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/80
[1996/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1996/29]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VERBUNDMATERIALS MIT LAMELLENARTIGER PHASE ZWISCHEN VERSTÄRKUNGSFIBERN UND MATRIX, UND NACH DIESEM VERFAHREN ERHALTENER WERKSTOFF[1996/29]
English:METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE MATERIAL WITH LAMELLAR INTERPHASE BETWEEN REINFORCING FIBRES AND MATRIX, AND MATERIAL OBTAINED[1996/29]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN MATERIAU COMPOSITE A INTERPHASE LAMELLAIRE ENTRE FIBRES DE RENFORT ET MATRICE, ET MATERIAU TEL QU'OBTENU PAR LE PROCEDE[1996/29]
Entry into regional phase18.03.1996National basic fee paid 
18.03.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
18.03.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.03.1996Examination requested  [1996/29]
06.08.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.1999Fee for grant paid
20.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
19.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
18.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
17.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0380375  (EUROP PROPULSION [FR]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 8; figure 5 * * the whole document * [A] 3-6,12-15;
 [E]EP0626360  (EUROP PROPULSION [FR]) [E] 1,7,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0528411  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0549224  (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1-4,10-13 * example 13 *;
 [A]EP0353380  (REFRACTORY COMPOSITES INC [US]) [A] 7-9 * the whole document *;
 [E]US5354602  (STRANFORD GERALD T [US], et al) [E] 1,4;
 [A]EP0172082  (EUROP PROPULSION [FR]) [A] 1,4,7,10,11,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0424036  (CORNING INC [US])