blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0719081

EP0719081 - AUTOMATIC MILKING MEANS REMOVAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2001
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.07.2001 [2001/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALFA LAVAL AGRI AB
Farm Center, P.O. Box 39
147 21 Tumba / SE
[1998/12]
Former [1996/27]For all designated states
Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA
Avenue Général-Guisan 70
1009 Pully / CH
Inventor(s)01 / OLOFSSON, Hans
Skogsvägen 17
S-141 44 Huddinge / SE
[1996/27]
Representative(s)Lerwill, John, et al
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/27]Lerwill, John, et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London, WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date94927895.614.09.1994
[1996/27]
WO1994SE00854
Priority number, dateSE1993000302116.09.1993         Original published format: SE 9303021
[1996/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9507606
Date:23.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0719081
Date:03.07.1996
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1996/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0719081
Date:09.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE23.03.1995
ClassificationIPC:A01J7/00
[1996/27]
CPC:
A01J5/017 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/27]
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN ABNEHMEN EINES MELKMITTELS[1996/27]
English:AUTOMATIC MILKING MEANS REMOVAL DEVICE[1996/27]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ENLEVEMENT AUTOMATIQUE DE TRAYEUSE[1996/27]
Entry into regional phase04.04.1996National basic fee paid 
04.04.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
04.04.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
04.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/27]
12.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.02.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2000Fee for grant paid
05.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.05.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE09.11.2000
[2001/27]
Cited inInternational search[A]US3603292  (FINCH NIGEL);
 [A]US3789798  (REISGIES R, et al);
 [A]NO138428B  (DEC INT [US]);
 [A]WO9300002  (ALFA LAVAL AGRI INT [SE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.