Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0720436

EP0720436 - FLEXIBLE RECLINING CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2001
Database last updated on 25.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Perry, Charles O.
20 Shorehaven Road
East Norwalk, CT 06855 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
PERRY, Charles, O.
20 Shorehaven Road
East Norwalk, CT 06855 / US
Former [1996/28]For all designated states
PERRY, Charles, O.
20 shorehaven Road
East Norwalk, CT 06855 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1996/28]
Representative(s)Zwirner, Gottfried , et al
Blumbach - Zinngrebe
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Alexandrastrasse 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/28]Zwirner, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. Dipl.-W.-Ing. , et al
Blumbach, Kramer & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenbergerstrasse 100
D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date94929099.322.08.1994
[1996/28]
WO1994US09384
Priority number, dateUS1993012118514.09.1993         Original published format: US 121185
[1996/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9507642
Date:23.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0720436
Date:10.07.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.1995
[1996/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0720436
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.03.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:A47C1/00, A47C3/021
[1997/19]
Former International [1996/28]A47C1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/28]
TitleGerman:FLEXIBLER LEHNSTUHL[1996/28]
English:FLEXIBLE RECLINING CHAIR[1996/28]
French:SIEGE INCLINABLE SOUPLE[1996/28]
Entry into regional phase15.03.1996National basic fee paid 
15.03.1996Search fee paid 
15.03.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
15.03.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.03.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.03.1996Examination requested  [1996/28]
16.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2000Fee for grant paid
27.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
08.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
26.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
GR03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
IE22.08.2000
LU22.08.2000
[2007/29]
Former [2004/07]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
GR03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
IE22.08.2000
Former [2003/45]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
IE22.08.2000
Former [2003/08]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
SE03.08.2000
IE22.08.2000
Former [2002/02]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
SE03.08.2000
IE22.08.2000
Former [2001/50]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
SE03.08.2000
IE22.08.2000
Former [2001/27]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
SE03.08.2000
Former [2001/11]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]US2532025  (JOHNSON ARTHUR E);
 [A]US2838095  (DEATON CHARLES U);
 [A]US4131315  (VOGTHERR BURKHARD);
 [A]US5009466  (PERRY CHARLES O [US])