Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0724587

EP0724587 - RING-EXPANDED NUCLEOSIDES AND NUCLEOTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.08.2003  [2003/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nabi
5800 Park of Commerce Boulevard N.W.
Boca Raton, FL 33487 / US
For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND BALTIMORE COUNTY
1000 Hilltop Circle
Baltimore, Maryland 21250 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/24]For all designated states
Nabi
5800 Park of Commerce Boulevard N.W.
Boca Raton, FL 33487 / US
For all designated states
University of Maryland Baltimore County
1000 Hilltop Circle
Baltimore, Maryland 21250 / US
Former [2002/10]For all designated states
Nabi
5800 Park of Commerce Boulevard N.W.
Boca Raton, FL 33487 / US
For all designated states
Hosmane, Ramachandra
6745 Sewells Orchard Drive
Columbia, MD 21045 / US
Former [1996/32]For all designated states
Burns, Barry
16 Dorset Hill Court
Owings Mills, MD 21117 / US
For all designated states
Hosmane, Ramachandra
6745 Sewells Orchard Drive
Columbia, MD 21045 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Burns, Barry
16 Dorset Hill Court
Owings Mills MD 21117 / US
02 / Hosmane, Ramchandra
6745 Sewell Orchard Drive
Columbia MD 21045 / US
 [2003/04]
Former [1996/32]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Marshall, Monica Anne
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/32]Marshall, Monica Anne
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date94929358.329.09.1994
[1996/32]
WO1994US10905
Priority number, dateUS1993012821229.09.1993         Original published format: US 128212
[1996/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9509175
Date:06.04.1995
Language:EN
[1995/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0724587
Date:07.08.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.1995
[1996/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0724587
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP0724587
Date:29.01.2003
[2003/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.04.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07H19/04, C07H19/052, C07D487/04, A61K31/70
[1996/50]
Former International [1996/32]C07H19/23, C07D519/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/32]
TitleGerman:NUKLEOSIDE UND NUKLEOTIDE MIT VERGRÖSSERTEN RINGEN[1996/32]
English:RING-EXPANDED NUCLEOSIDES AND NUCLEOTIDES[1996/32]
French:NUCLEOSIDES ET NUCLEOTIDES A CYCLE ELARGI[1996/32]
Entry into regional phase19.04.1996National basic fee paid 
19.04.1996Search fee paid 
19.04.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
19.04.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/32]
15.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.02.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.04.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
01.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
28.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2002Fee for grant paid
15.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02001587.1  / EP1227103
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Request for further processing for:27.04.2000Request for further processing filed
27.04.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.05.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200108   M06   Fee paid on   13.12.2001
Documents cited:Search[PX]  A.BHAN ET AL., "Reactions of Ring-Expanded Xanthines Containing the Imidazo(4,5-e)(1,4)diazepine Ring System", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, (199310), vol. 30, no. 5, pages 1453 - 1462, XP000605435 [PX] 12-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570300544
International search[A]US4713372  (SCHAUMBERG JOHN P [US], et al);
 [A]US4151347  (KONDO SHINICHI [JP], et al);
 [A]US4163839  (KONDO SHINICHI [JP], et al);
 [A]US4935505  (TOWNSEND LEROY B [US], et al)