Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0722339

EP0722339 - $i(VIBRIO CHOLERAE) 01 (CVD111) AND NON-01 (CVD112 AND CVD112RM) SEROGROUP VACCINE STRAINS AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.12.2001
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.01.2002  [2002/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND AT BALTIMORE
660 West Redwood Street Baltimore
Maryland 21201 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/30]For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND AT BALTIMORE
660 West Redwood Street
Baltimore Maryland 21201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KAPER, James B.
9333 Curtsey Court
Columbia, MD 21045 / US
02 / LEVINE, Myron M.
5209 Windmille Lane
Columbia, MD 21044 / US
[1996/30]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/30]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date94930665.807.10.1994
[1996/30]
WO1994US11424
Priority number, dateUS1993013343808.10.1993         Original published format: US 133438
US1993013343908.10.1993         Original published format: US 133439
[1996/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9510300
Date:20.04.1995
Language:EN
[1995/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0722339
Date:24.07.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.1995
[1996/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.04.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/106, C12N1/21, C12N15/63, C12N15/65, C12N15/74, C12R1/63, // C07K14/28
[2001/21]
Former International [1996/30]A61K39/106, C12N1/21, C12N15/63, C12N15/65, C12N15/74, C12R1/63
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/30]
TitleGerman:IMPFSTÄMME DER SEROGRUPPE 01 (CVD111) UND NICHT-01 (CVD112 UND CVD112RM) VON -i(VIBRIO CHOLERAE) UND METHODEN IHRER HERSTELLUNG[1996/30]
English:$i(VIBRIO CHOLERAE) 01 (CVD111) AND NON-01 (CVD112 AND CVD112RM) SEROGROUP VACCINE STRAINS AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME[1996/30]
French:SOUCHES DE VACCINS DES SEROGROUPES 01 (CVD111) ET NON-01 (CVD112 ET CVD112RM) DU $i(VIBRIO CHOLERAE) ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DESDITES SOUCHES[1996/30]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase21.11.1995National basic fee paid 
21.11.1995Search fee paid 
21.11.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.05.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.11.1995Examination requested  [1996/30]
21.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/04]
27.07.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/04]
Request for further processing for:27.05.1998Request for further processing filed
27.05.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.06.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
08.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199906   M06   Fee paid on   08.12.1999
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO9401533  (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [PX] 1-29 * page 11 - page 12 *;
 [X]WO9118979  (UNIV MARYLAND [US]) [X] 20,21 * examples 10,11 *;
 [A]US5135862  (KAPER JAMES B [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - LEVINE M M ET AL, RECOMBINANT LIVE CHOLERA VACCINES, VIBRIO CHOLERAE AND CHOLERA: MOLECULAR TO GLOBAL PERSPECTIVES,US,AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY,, PAGE(S) 395-413, XP000886576 [A] 1-29 * the whole document *
 [A]  - CHOLERA WORKING GROUP, "Large epidemic of cholera-like disease in Bangladesh caused by vibrio 0139 synonym Bengal", THE LANCET, (19930814), vol. 342, pages 387 - 390, XP000973630 [A] 1-29 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0140-6736(93)91906-3
 [A]  - PEARSON ET AL, "CTX genetic element encodes a site-specific recomnation system and an intestinal colonization factor", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,US,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, (19930401), vol. 90, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3750 - 3754, XP002085116 [A] 1-29 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.8.3750
 [T]  - TACKET ET AL, "Initial Clinical Studies of CVD 112 Vibrio Cholerae O139 Live Oral Vaccine: Safety and Efficacy against Experimental Challenge", THE JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (1995), vol. 172, pages 883 - 886, XP000973598 [T] 1-29
International search[Y]US5135862  (KAPER JAMES B [US], et al)
 [Y]  - JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, Volume 165, No. 3, issued March 1986, I. GOLDBERG et al., "Cloning of the in Vibrio cholerae recA gene and construction of a vibrio cholerea recA mutant", pages 715-722.
 [Y]  - INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, Volume 58, No. 5, issued May 1990, J.M. KETLEY et al., "Diminished immunogenicity of a recombination-deficient derivative of Vibrio cholerae vaccine strain CVD103", pages 1481-1484.
 [Y]  - FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS, Volume 106, issued January 1993, T. KARASAWA et al., "Distribution of the zot (zonula occludens toxin) gene among strains of Vibrio cholerae 01 and non-01", pages 143-146.
 [XPY]  - INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, Volume 61, No. 10, J. MICHALSKI et al., "CVD110, an attenuated Vibrio cholerae 01 El Tor live oral vaccine strain", pages 4462-4467.
 [XPY]  - JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, Volume 168, issued December 1993, C.O. TACKET et al., "Safety and immunogenicity of live oral choleral vaccine candidate CVD 110, a derivative of El Tor Ogawa Vibrio cholerae", pages 1536-1540.