Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0728174

EP0728174 - PARTICULATE SUSPENDING ANTIMICROBIAL ADDITIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  05.03.2004
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ECOLAB INC.
Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street
St. Paul, MN 55102-2233 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/35]For all designated states
ECOLAB INC.
Ecolab Center
St. Paul Minnesota 55102 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GUTZMANN, Timothy, Allen
616 Crimson Leaf Court
Eagan, MN 55123 / US
02 / ALTIER, Mark, R.
890 Juno Avenue
St. Paul, MN 55102 / US
[1996/35]
Representative(s)Plougmann Vingtoft a/s
Strandvejen 70
2900 Hellerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [1996/35]Plougmann, Vingtoft & Partners A/S
Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007
1021 Copenhagen K / DK
Application number, filing date94931395.117.10.1994
[1996/35]
WO1994US11800
Priority number, dateUS1993015095112.11.1993         Original published format: US 150951
[1996/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9513342
Date:18.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0728174
Date:28.08.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.1995
[1996/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.05.1995
ClassificationInternational:C10M173/02, C11D1/94, // (C10M173/02, 133:06), C10N30:16, C10N40:00
[1996/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/35]
TitleGerman:TEILCHENSUSPENDIERFÄHIGE ANTIMICROBIELLE ZUSÄTZE[1996/35]
English:PARTICULATE SUSPENDING ANTIMICROBIAL ADDITIVES[1996/35]
French:ADDITIFS ANTIMICROBIENS AMELIORANT LA SUSPENSION DE PARTICULES[1996/35]
Entry into regional phase12.06.1996National basic fee paid 
12.06.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/35]
26.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.1998Date of oral proceedings
17.07.1998Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/17]
17.07.1998Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.07.1998Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/17]
Appeal following examination24.09.1998Appeal received No.  T0962/98
03.11.1998Statement of grounds filed
05.03.2003Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M06) [2003/10]
27.08.2003Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2003/35]
15.01.2004Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
05.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
04.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
09.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9318120  (HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT) [X] 1-8,10,12-19,21,23-27,32-39 * page 9, line 12 - line 15 * * page 10, line 23 - line 30 * * page 13, line 1 - line 3 * * page 16; example 6 * * page 17; example 8 * * claims 1-3,8,9 *;
 [X]JPH0255794  ;
 [X]GB1068378  (MICHIGAN TOOL COMPANY) [X] 1-7,10,13-18,21,24,28,30,32-38 * page 1, line 42 - line 49 * * page 3, line 2 - line 19 * * page 6; table 2 * * page 7, line 1 - line 16 *;
 [A]US4264479  (J.J FLANAGAN) [A] 28-31 * column 3, line 42 - line 45 * * column 4, line 34 - line 45 * * column 5, line 24 * * column 5, line 59 - line 60 * * column 6; example 1 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]US3960742  (E.O. LEONARD) [A] 28-31 * column 3, line 14 - line 15 * * column 5; example II *;
 [A]SU1079662  ;
 [A]WO9213050  (ECOLAB INC.) [A] 9,20,26 * page 5, line 10 - line 12 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9213048  (ECOLAB INC.) [A] * claims 1,25 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 14, Database accession no. 90-104332, & JPH0255794 A 19900226 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND KK) [X] 1-7,10,12-18,21,23,24 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 84, no. 44, Database accession no. 84-275127, & SU1079662 A 19840315 (CHEM IND RES PLN IN) [A] * abstract *