Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0726801

EP0726801 - PROCESS FOR SEPARATING A MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/34]PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING A MIXTURE
[1999/25]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RHONE-POULENC RORER GMBH
Postfach 35 01 20
50792 Köln / DE
[1996/34]
Inventor(s)01 / ULBRICH, Bernhard
Rotdornweg 1
D-50189 Elsdorf / DE
02 / JENDRNY, Heinz
Haberlandstrasse 32b
D-41539 Dormagen / DE
[1996/34]
Representative(s)Lau-Loskill, Philipp
Berger Dorfstrasse 35
41189 Mönchengladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/34]Lau-Loskill, Philipp, Dipl.-Phys.
Berger Dorfstrasse 35
41189 Mönchengladbach / DE
Former [1996/34]Döring, Wolfgang, Dr. Ing. , et al
Mörikestrasse 18
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date94931492.627.10.1994
[1996/34]
WO1994DE01270
Priority number, dateDE1993433728902.11.1993         Original published format: DE 4337289
[1996/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9512445
Date:11.05.1995
Language:DE
[1995/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0726801
Date:21.08.1996
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1995
[1996/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0726801
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.05.1995
ClassificationInternational:B01D15/02, C07D305/14
[1996/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/34]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM AUFTRENNEN EINES GEMISCHES[1999/25]
English:PROCESS FOR SEPARATING A MIXTURE[1999/25]
French:PROCEDE POUR LA SEPARATION D'UN MELANGE[1999/25]
Former [1996/34]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFTRENNEN EINES GEMISCHES
Former [1996/34]PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING A MIXTURE
Former [1996/34]PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA SEPARATION D'UN MELANGE
Entry into regional phase13.12.1995National basic fee paid 
13.12.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.12.1995Examination requested  [1996/34]
19.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.03.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
25.03.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
15.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.1999Fee for grant paid
07.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Request for further processing for:15.05.1998Request for further processing filed
15.05.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.07.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
21.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US2738880  (WHITNEY) [X] 1-7,11-13,24-27,30 * column 2, line 24 - column 5, line 65 *;
 [X]US2678132  (BEARD) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,11-14,24-29 * column 3, line 42 - column 7, line 42 *;
 [A]WO9207842  (UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA) [A] 14-16,19 * page 8, line 1 - page 14, line 26 *;
 [X]US4758349  (MA) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,13,24,26,27 * column 9, line 18 - column 12, line 9 *;
 [A]US4761236  (DICKEY) [A] 8 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 3 *;
 [A]EP0495640  (SOKEN KAGAKU) [A] 20,21 * page 7, lines 54-58 *