Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0727962

EP0727962 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR THE AUTOMATIC DETECTION OF ABNORMAL BREATHING SOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
For all designated states
UFZ-UMWELTFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM Leipzig-Halle GmbH
Permoser Strasse 15
04318 Leipzig / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
For all designated states
UFZ-UMWELTFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM Leipzig-Halle GmbH
Permoser Strasse 15
04318 Leipzig / DE
Former [1996/35]For all designated states
FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
For all designated states
UFZ-UMWELTFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM
Leipzig-Halle, Permoser Strasse 15
D-04318 Leipzig / DE
Inventor(s)01 / OBERST, Eberhard
Hohestrasse 63
D-01187 Dresden / DE
02 / BECKER, Hans
Weinbergstrasse 76
D-01129 Dresden / DE
03 / KRUMBIEGEL, Peter
Kleiststrasse 8
D-04257 Leipzig / DE
04 / HERBARTH, Olf
Schlegelstrasse 9
D-04275 Leipzig / DE
[1996/35]
Representative(s)Gagel, Roland
Patentanwalt Dr. Roland Gagel
Landsberger Strasse 480a
81241 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/23]Gagel, Roland, Dr.
Patentanwalt Dr. Roland Gagel, Zanderweg 4
86444 Mühlhausen / DE
Former [1997/51](deleted)
...
Former [1996/35]Lins, Edgar, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.jur.
Patentanwälte Gramm + Lins Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
Application number, filing date94931501.428.10.1994
[1996/35]
WO1994DE01282
Priority number, dateDE1993433846611.11.1993         Original published format: DE 4338466
[1996/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9513019
Date:18.05.1995
Language:DE
[1995/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0727962
Date:28.08.1996
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.1995
[1996/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0727962
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.05.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61B7/00, A61B5/08
[1996/35]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/35]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN ERFASSUNG AUFFÄLLIGER ATEMGERÄUSCHE[1996/35]
English:PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR THE AUTOMATIC DETECTION OF ABNORMAL BREATHING SOUNDS[1996/35]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION AUTOMATIQUE DE BRUITS RESPIRATOIRES ANORMAUX[1996/35]
Entry into regional phase19.06.1996National basic fee paid 
19.06.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.03.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/35]
05.08.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.1999Fee for grant paid
21.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.06.1996BE   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.1996
19.06.1996DE   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.1996
19.06.1996FR   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.1996
19.06.1996GB   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.1996
19.06.1996IT   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.1996
19.06.1996NL   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.1996
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
19.06.1996M01   Fee paid on   19.06.1996
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199704   M06   Fee paid on   19.12.1997
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0371424  (MADAUS MEDIZIN ELEKTRONIK [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,8,14-16,10-12 * page 2, line 50 - page 3, line 38 * * page 3, line 54 - page 5, line 7 * * page 6, line 2 - line 44 *;
 [X]EP0504945  (MADAUS MEDIZIN ELEKTRONIK [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,8,15 * column 8, line 46 - column 9, line 31 * * column 10, line 4 - column 11, line 40 *;
 [DYA]WO9103981  (MURPHY RAYMOND L H [US]) [DY] 1,8,15 * page 19, line 5 - page 22, line 32 * [A] 3,9,14;
 [YA]US5133346  (KULKARNI CHANDRAKUMAR D [US]) [Y] 1,8,15 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 23 * * column 3, line 21 - line 65 * [A] 4,13,16,17;
 [A]GB2240392  (DONNELLY RORY JOSEPH, et al) [A] 1,4,6,7,12,14-17 * page 2, line 1 - line 30 * * page 4, line 23 - page 7, line 16 *