Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0724411

EP0724411 - HOLDER FOR A MEDICAL OR SURGICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: FR
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ognier, Jean-François
Chemin des Carrières du Planas
84500 Bollene Saint Pierre / FR
[1999/22]
Former [1996/32]For all designated states
Ognier, Jean-François
Aulhac
F-15240 Saignes / FR
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1996/32]
Representative(s)Maureau, Philippe , et al
Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU
12, rue Boileau
B.P. 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/22]Maureau, Philippe , et al
Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [1996/32]Maureau, Philippe
Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU BP 3011
69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR
Application number, filing date94931615.220.10.1994
[1996/32]
WO1994FR01225
Priority number, dateFR1993001277921.10.1993         Original published format: FR 9312779
[1996/32]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9510985
Date:27.04.1995
Language:FR
[1995/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0724411
Date:07.08.1996
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.1995
[1996/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0724411
Date:16.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.04.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61B19/00
[1996/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1996/32]
TitleGerman:HALTER FÜR EIN MEDIZINISCHES ODER CHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT[1996/32]
English:HOLDER FOR A MEDICAL OR SURGICAL INSTRUMENT[1996/32]
French:DISPOSITIF SUPPORT POUR INSTRUMENT MEDICAL OU CHIRURGICAL[1996/32]
Entry into regional phase15.05.1996National basic fee paid 
15.05.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.03.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.05.1996Examination requested  [1996/32]
30.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
07.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
23.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.1999Fee for grant paid
05.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199906   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.02.2000
[2015/21]
Former [2001/16]AT16.02.2000
FR13.07.2000
Former [2001/08]AT16.02.2000
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0167345  (MICRA LTD [GB]) [DA] 1,2 * page 3, line 25 - line 31; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0415417  (ANDRONIC DEVICES LTD [CA]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE2514496  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [A] 1,3 * figures 1,4; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]FR2339936  (MEIER HANS [CH]);
 [A]EP0486999  (ANDRONIC DEVICES LTD [CA]);
 [A]US4867404  (HARRINGTON FRANK S [US], et al)