blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0729362

EP0729362 - TRANSDERMAL COMPOSITION OF N- N- 5- 4-(AMINOIMINOMETHYL)PHENYL]-1-OXOPENTYL]-L-alpha-ASPARTYL]-L-PHENYLALANINE OR ITS ESTERS AND THEIR PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/36]TRANSDERMAL COMPOSITION OF N- N- 5- 4-(AMINOIMINOMETHYL)PHENYL]-1-OXOPENTYL]-L-$g(a)-ASPARTYL]-L-PHENYLALANINE OR ITS ESTERS AND THEIR PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTS
[1999/12]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G.D. Searle & Co.
P.O. Box 5110
Chicago IL 60680-5110 / US
[2008/38]
Former [1996/36]For all designated states
G.D. SEARLE & CO.
Corporate Patent Department P.O. Box 5110
Chicago IL 60680-5110 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FEIGEN, Larry, P.
25765 Lakeshore Court
Wauconda, IL 60062 / US
02 / GRIFFIN, Martin, John
4821 Crain
Shokie, IL 60077 / US
[1996/36]
Representative(s)Beil, Hans Christoph, et al
Hansmann & Vogeser
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/36]Beil, Hans Christoph, Dr., et al
Hansmann & Vogeser, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 80 01 40
65901 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date94931926.324.10.1994
[1996/36]
WO1994US11921
Priority number, dateUS1993015504419.11.1993         Original published format: US 155044
[1996/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9513825
Date:26.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0729362
Date:04.09.1996
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1996/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0729362
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.05.1995
ClassificationIPC:A61K38/05
[1996/36]
CPC:
A61K38/05 (EP); A61P7/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/36]
TitleGerman:TRANSDERMALE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG VON N-(N-(5-(4-(AMINOIMINOMETHYL)PHENYL-1-OXOPENTYL)-L-ALPHA-ASPARTYL)-L-PHENYLALANIN ODER DEREN ESTERDERIVATEN UND IHRE PHARMAZEUTISCHVERWENDBAREN SALZE[1999/35]
English:TRANSDERMAL COMPOSITION OF N- N- 5- 4-(AMINOIMINOMETHYL)PHENYL]-1-OXOPENTYL]-L-alpha-ASPARTYL]-L-PHENYLALANINE OR ITS ESTERS AND THEIR PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTS[1999/12]
French:PREPARATION TRANSDERMIQUE DE N- N- 5- 4-(AMINOIMINOMETHYL)PHENYL]-1-OXOPENTYL]-L-alpha-ASPARTYL]-L-PHENYLALANINE OU DE SES ESTERS ET DE LEURS SELS ACCEPTABLES PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT[1999/12]
Former [1996/36]TRANSDERMALE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG VON N-(N-(5-(4-(AMINOIMINOMETHYL)PHENYL-1-OXOPENTYL)-L-ALPHA-ASPARTYL)-L-PHENYLALANIN ODER DER ESTERDERIVATE UND IHRE PHARMAZEUTISCHVERWENDBAREN SALZE
Former [1996/36]TRANSDERMAL COMPOSITION OF N- N- 5- 4-(AMINOIMINOMETHYL)PHENYL]-1-OXOPENTYL]-L-$g(a)-ASPARTYL]-L-PHENYLALANINE OR ITS ESTERS AND THEIR PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTS
Former [1996/36]PREPARATION TRANSDERMIQUE DE N- N- 5- 4-(AMINOIMINOMETHYL)PHENYL]-1-OXOPENTYL]-L-$g(a)-ASPARTYL]-L-PHENYLALANINE OU DE SES ESTERS ET DE LEURS SELS ACCEPTABLES PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT
Entry into regional phase16.04.1996National basic fee paid 
16.04.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
16.04.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/36]
30.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
24.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
15.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.1999Fee for grant paid
10.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
05.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
04.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR12.01.2000
[2008/24]
Cited inInternational search[DX]EP0502536  (SEARLE & CO [US]) [DX] 1-10 * page 11, line 36 - page 12, line 20; example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0506956  (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]EP0513675  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,7 * page 3, line 1 - line 38; example 1 * * page 15, line 37 - page 16, line 3 *;
 [A]WO9318058  (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 2 *;
 [PA]WO9324520  (MERRELL DOW PHARMA [US]) [PA] 1-10 * page 112, line 16 - page 115, line 10 *;
 [PX]WO9405694  (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-10 * page 9, line 21 - page 12, line 10; example -; claim - *
 [A]  - MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US [A] 1,7 * abstract *
    [ ] - R.M. KEIMOWITZ ET AL., "Transdermal modification of platelet function. A dermal aspirin preparation selectively inhibits platelet cyclooxygenase and preserves prostacyclin biosynthesis", CIRCULATION, vol. 88, no. 2, pages 556 - 61
    [ ] - J.C. HOGAN ET AL., "Glyceryl trinitrate and platelet aggregation: effects of N-acetyl-cysteine", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY, vol. 27, no. 5, pages 617 - 619
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.