Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0724720

EP0724720 - CONTINUOUS, REAL TIME MICROWAVE PLASMA ELEMENT SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
For all designated states
BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE
Pacific Northwest Laboratories Intellectual Property Services 902 Battelle Boulevard P.O. Box 999
Richland, WA 99352 / US
For all designated states
ELECTO - PYROLYSIS, INC.
Suite 1118, 996 Old Eagle School Road Wayne
Pennsylvania 19087 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]For all designated states
MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
For all designated states
BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE
Pacific Northwest Laboratories Intellectual Property Services 902 Battelle Boulevard P.O. Box 999
Richland, WA 99352 / US
For all designated states
ELECTO - PYROLYSIS, INC.
Suite 1118, 996 Old Eagle School Road
Wayne, Pennsylvania 19087 / US
Former [1996/32]For all designated states
MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
For all designated states
BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE
Pacific Northwest Laboratories P.O. Box 999
Richland, WA 99352 / US
For all designated states
ELECTO - PYROLYSIS, INC.
Suite 1118, 996 Old Eagle School Road
Wayne, Pennsylvania 19087 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WOSKOV, Paul, P.
4 Ledgewood Drive
Bedford, MA 01730 / US
02 / SMATLAK, Donna, L.
10 Village Hill Road
Belmont, MA 02178 / US
03 / COHN, Daniel, R.
26 Walnut Hill Road
Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US
04 / WITTLE, J. Kenneth
1740 Conestoga Road
Chester Springs, PA 19425 / US
05 / TITUS, Charles, H.
323 Echo Valley Lane
Newton Square, PA 19073 / US
06 / SURMA, Jeffrey E.
806 Brian Lane
Kennewick, WA 99337 / US
[2000/18]
Former [1996/32]01 / WOSKOV, Paul, P.
4 Ledgewood Drive
Bedford, MA 01730 / US
02 / SMATLAK, Donna, L.
167 Waverly Street
Arlington, MA 02174 / US
03 / COHN, Daniel, R.
26 Walnut Hill Road
Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US
04 / WITTLE, J. Kenneth
1740 Conestoga Road
Chester Springs, PA 19425 / US
05 / TITUS, Charles, H.
323 Echo Valley Lane
Newton Square, PA 19073 / US
06 / SURMA, Jeffrey E.
806 Brian Lane
Kennewick, WA 99337 / US
Representative(s)Greenwood, John David
Graham Watt & Co LLP
St Botolph's House
7-9 St Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/32]Greenwood, John David
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead
Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Application number, filing date94932014.724.10.1994
[1996/32]
WO1994US12187
Priority number, dateUS1993014185722.10.1993         Original published format: US 141857
[1996/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9511442
Date:27.04.1995
Language:EN
[1995/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0724720
Date:07.08.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.1995
[1996/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0724720
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.04.1995
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/73, G01N21/68
[1996/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/32]
TitleGerman:KONTINUIERLICHER MIKROWELLENPLASMA-ELEMENTSENSOR IN ECHTZEIT[1996/32]
English:CONTINUOUS, REAL TIME MICROWAVE PLASMA ELEMENT SENSOR[1996/32]
French:DETECTEUR UTILISANT UN PLASMA PRODUIT PAR DES MICRO-ONDES, FONCTIONNANT EN TEMPS REEL ET EN CONTINU[1996/32]
Entry into regional phase03.05.1996National basic fee paid 
03.05.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
03.05.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
29.04.1996Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.1996Examination requested  [1996/32]
09.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.12.1999Fee for grant paid
09.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
05.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
GR03.05.2000
IT03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
IE24.10.2000
LU24.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2004/39]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
GR03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
IE24.10.2000
LU24.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2004/07]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
GR03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
IE24.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2003/45]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
IE24.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2003/08]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
IE24.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2002/42]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
IE24.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2002/26]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
IE24.10.2000
Former [2002/17]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
IE24.10.2000
Former [2002/02]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
Former [2001/27]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
Former [2001/16]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
Former [2001/11]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0395798  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,11,14,24 * page 3, line 33 - page 5, line 44; figure - *
 [DA]  - Y.OKAMOTO, "Annular-Shaped Microwave-Induced Nitrogen Plasma at Atmospheric Pressure for Emission Spectrometry of Solutions", ANALYTICAL SCIENCES, (199104), vol. 7, pages 283 - 288, [DA] 1,7,8,10,11,15,24 * page 283 - page 285, column L, paragraph 2; figure 1 *
 [DA]  - K.A.FORBES ET AL., "Comparison of Microwave-induced Plasma Sources", JOURNAL OF ANALYTICAL ATOMIC SPECTROMETRY, (199102), vol. 6, pages 57 - 71, [DA] 1,11,12,20,24 * page 58, column R, paragraph L - page 59, column R, paragraph 3; figure 4 *
 [DA]  - A.T.ZANDER ET AL., "Microwave-supported Discharges", APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY, BALTIMORE US, (1981), vol. 35, no. 4, pages 357 - 371, [DA] 1,24 * page 363 - page 367, column L, paragraph 1 *
 [DA]  - T.ISHIZUKA, "Atomic Emission Spectrometry of Solid Samples with Laser Vaporization-Microwave Induced Plasma System", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, COLUMBUS US, (1980), vol. 52, pages 125 - 19, [DA] 22,24,25 * the whole document *