Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0665324

EP0665324 - Compositions that introduce variations in color density into dyed cellulosic fabrics [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007Revocation of patentpublished on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC.
925 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
[2002/18]
Former [1995/31]For all designated states
ECOLAB INC.
Ecolab Center
St. Paul Minnesota 55102 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Olson, Lynne A.
N. 5006 860thn Avenue South
Ellsworth, Wisconsin 54011 / US
[1995/31]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/18]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2001/05]Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte
An den Gärten 7
51491 Overath / DE
Former [1995/31]Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Maiwald & Partner, Poccistrasse 11
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date95100251.808.07.1988
[1995/31]
Priority number, dateUS1987009695315.09.1987         Original published format: US 96953
[1995/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0665324
Date:02.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0665324
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.1995
ClassificationInternational:D06M16/00, C11D3/386, C11D11/00
[1995/31]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LU,   NL,   SE [1995/31]
TitleGerman:Zusammensetzungen zum Einbringen von Unterschieden der Farbdichte in gefärbten Cellulosetextilien[1995/31]
English:Compositions that introduce variations in color density into dyed cellulosic fabrics[1995/31]
French:Compositions pour introduire des variations de densité de couleur dans des matériaux textiles cellulosiques teints[1995/31]
Examination procedure10.01.1995Examination requested  [1995/31]
05.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.1999Date of oral proceedings
03.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
03.02.1999Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
06.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.1999Fee for grant paid
04.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP88110929.2  / EP0307564
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.10.2000  31.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
NOVOZYMES A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Miles, John Stephen
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2007/01]
Opponent(s)01  11.10.2000  31.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
NOVOZYMES A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Miles, John Stephen
Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2001/11]
Opponent(s)01  11.10.2000  31.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
NOVOZYMES A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Zimmer, Franz-Josef, Dr.
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/49]
Opponent(s)01  11.10.2000   
NOVO NORDISK A/S
Novo Alle
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Zimmer, Franz-Josef, Dr.
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
20.11.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.03.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.03.2002Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
20.12.2006Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/21]
20.12.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition13.05.2002Appeal received No.  T0475/02
11.07.2002Statement of grounds filed
20.12.2006Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
20.12.2006Date of oral proceedings
27.12.2006Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
10.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
10.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
18.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 08
20.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 09
23.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 10
29.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 11
23.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.08.199508   M06   Fee paid on   18.08.1995
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU08.07.2000
SE09.07.2003
GR05.02.2004
[2005/23]
Former [2004/33]SE09.07.2003
GR05.02.2004
Former [2004/24]SE09.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0220016  (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [A] 1 * claim - *;
 [A]US4443355  (MURATA MORIYASU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *;
 [A]US4435307  (BARBESGAARD PEDER O [DK], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *;
 [A]US4479881  (TAI HO T [FR]) [A] 1 * claim - *
ExaminationGB2094826
    "Enzymatisk Vask" in Folkebladet of 19/01/1988,
    "OPEN POCKET WASHER-EXTRACTORS", a brochure by the Pellerin Milnor Corp., Kenner, LA 70063 (US),
    Ch.L.Riggs & J.C.Sherill: "Textile Laundering Technology"; Textile Rental Sevices Association of America, Hallandale, FL 33009 (US); p. 89-97,