Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0667210

EP0667210 - Polishing head, particularly for slabs of marble, granite, porcelainized gres, and other stone materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIMEC S.P.A.
Via E. Fermi 4
31030 Castello di Godego (Treviso) / IT
[N/P]
Former [1995/33]For all designated states
SIMEC S.P.A.
Via E. Fermi 4
I-31030 Castello di Godego (Treviso) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Stangherlin, Ampelio
Via Trento
I-31030, Castello di Godego, Treviso / IT
[1995/33]
Representative(s)O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph , et al
Maroscia & Associati S.r.l.
Contrà Porti, 21
36100 Vicenza / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/37]O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph , et al
Maroscia & Associati Srl Contrà Porti, 21
36100 Vicenza / IT
Former [1999/35]O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph , et al
c/o Maroscia & Associati s.r.l., Corso Palladio, 42
36100 Vicenza / IT
Former [1998/31]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [1995/33]Forattini, Amelia
c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1
I-20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date95100598.218.01.1995
[1995/33]
Priority number, dateIT1994VI0001709.02.1994         Original published format: IT VI940017
[1995/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0667210
Date:16.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0667210
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.1995
ClassificationInternational:B24B41/047
[1995/33]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   NL,   PT [1995/33]
TitleGerman:Polierkopf, insbesondere für Marmorplatten, Granit, Keramik, und anderes Gestein[1995/33]
English:Polishing head, particularly for slabs of marble, granite, porcelainized gres, and other stone materials[1995/33]
French:Tête de polissage, en particulier pour plaques de marbre, granit, céramique, et autres matériaux pierreux[1995/33]
Examination procedure03.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/17]
05.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.1999Fee for grant paid
18.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
20.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE19.04.2000
FR19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2003/08]BE19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2002/13]BE19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2001/16]BE19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2001/11]BE19.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0448847  (ZAMBON S N C OFF MEC FLLI [IT]) [X] 1-3 * column W *;
 [X]EP0510603  (SIMEC SPA [IT]) [X] 4-6,10-12 * Document cited in the application; column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 44; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]FR2565148  (BALENCIAGA EIZMENDI ALBERTO [ES]) [A] 7-9 * abstract *