Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0675575

EP0675575 - Low-voltage current line [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRUCK GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 22 A
44628 Herne / DE
[2000/14]
Former [1995/40]For all designated states
BRUCK GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 22 A
D-44628 Herne / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bruck, Jochen
Industriestrasse 22a
D-44628 Herne / DE
[1995/40]
Representative(s)Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner , et al
Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl
Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner
Massenbergstrasse 19-21
44787 Bochum / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/40]Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Schaeferstrasse 18
D-44623 Herne / DE
Application number, filing date95101146.927.01.1995
[1995/40]
Priority number, dateDE19940004914U23.03.1994         Original published format: DE 9404914 U
[1995/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0675575
Date:04.10.1995
Language:DE
[1995/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0675575
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.08.1995
ClassificationInternational:H01R25/14, F21V21/34
[1995/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [1995/40]
TitleGerman:Niedervolt-Stromleitung[1995/40]
English:Low-voltage current line[1995/40]
French:Ligne de courant basse tension[1999/36]
Former [1995/40]Ligne basse reusion
Examination procedure25.03.1996Examination requested  [1996/22]
09.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2000Fee for grant paid
02.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[YA]US3559149  (SHAGENA JACK L JR) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 11 - line 25; figure -; claim - * [A] 2,3,7,9,14;
 [YA]DE9109687U  (LANGE) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,6,7,9,14;
 [YA]DE8814659U  (KANIA) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-9;
 [A]DE9004781U  (STAFF) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3708608  (WYMAN D) [A] 1-3,7,9,14 * column A; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]FR2027501  (COMP GENERALE ELECTRICITE) [A] 14,18-20 * figures 4,5; claim - *