EP0673807 - Method and apparatus for inflating an inflatable vehicle occupant restraint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS INC. 1900 Richmond Road Lyndhurst Ohio 44124 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | For all designated states TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS INC. 1900 Richmond Road Lyndhurst Ohio 44124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Louis R. 307 Ridgemont Oxford, Michigan 48370 / US | 02 /
Burley, Edward H. 71455 Fisher Rd. Romeo, Michigan 48065 / US | 03 /
Layer, Peter F. 6102 Campbell Blvd. Lockport, New York 14094 / US | [1995/39] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/39] | Wagner, Karl H., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95101252.5 | 30.01.1995 | [1995/39] | Priority number, date | US19940209565 | 10.03.1994 Original published format: US 209565 | [1995/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0673807 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0673807 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0673807 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/22, B60R21/26, B60R21/16 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
B60R21/23138 (EP,US);
B60R21/26 (EP,KR,US);
B60R21/20 (KR);
B60R21/207 (EP,US);
B60R21/21 (EP,US);
B60R21/217 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufblasen einer Fahrzeuginsassen-Rückhaltevorrichtung | [1995/39] | English: | Method and apparatus for inflating an inflatable vehicle occupant restraint | [1995/39] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de gonflage d'un système de retenue gonflable pour occupant de véhicule | [1995/39] | Examination procedure | 30.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 13.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.03.2001 | FR | 14.03.2001 | IT | 14.03.2001 | NL | 14.03.2001 | SE | 14.06.2001 | ES | 27.09.2001 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 14.03.2001 | |
FR | 14.03.2001 | ||
NL | 14.03.2001 | ||
SE | 14.06.2001 | ||
ES | 27.09.2001 | ||
Former [2004/04] | BE | 14.03.2001 | |
NL | 14.03.2001 | ||
SE | 14.06.2001 | ||
FR | 10.08.2001 | ||
ES | 27.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/08] | BE | 14.03.2001 | |
NL | 14.03.2001 | ||
SE | 14.06.2001 | ||
FR | 10.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/17] | BE | 14.03.2001 | |
SE | 14.06.2001 | ||
FR | 10.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | BE | 14.03.2001 | |
SE | 14.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/03] | BE | 14.03.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3586347 (CAREY WILLIAM R, et al) [X] 13 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 75; figures 1-6 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 15; figure 9 * [A] 1,6,8; | [XA]GB2268132 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 13 * page 2, line 20 - page 4; figure . * [A] 1,6,8; | [XA]DE3818185 (DAIMLER-BENZ A.G.) [X] 13 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 13; figure - * [A] 1,6,8; | [A]DE4204280 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,5,6,8,9,13 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 15; figure 1 * |