Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0701068

EP0701068 - Insulation anchor dowell [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.05.2001
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.06.2001 [2001/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOGE-Dübel A. Gerhard KG
Illesheimer Strasse 10
90431 Nürnberg / DE
[1997/15]
Former [1996/11]For all designated states
"TOGE-DÜBEL" A. Gerhard GmbH
Illesheimer Strasse 10
D-90431 Nürnberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gerhard, Anton
Illesheimer Strasse 10
D-90431 Nürnberg / DE
[1996/11]
Representative(s)Rau, Manfred
Rau, Schneck & Hübner
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Königstrasse 2
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/11]Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing.
Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2
D-90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date95101322.601.02.1995
[1996/11]
Priority number, dateDE1994443220109.09.1994         Original published format: DE 4432201
[1996/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0701068
Date:13.03.1996
Language:DE
[1996/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0701068
Date:05.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.1996
ClassificationInternational:F16B19/00, E04F13/08
[1996/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1996/11]
TitleGerman:Isolierdorn-Dübel[1996/11]
English:Insulation anchor dowell[1996/11]
French:Cheville d'ancre d'isolation[1996/11]
Examination procedure06.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/36]
11.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.1999Fee for grant paid
04.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
06.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE3340750  (HILTI AG [LI]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP0215675  (PRIEST BENJAMIN & SONS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,2 * column 1, paragraph 1; figure -; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]FR2172512  (CEM CO INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * figure - *;
 [A]DE3212160  (ERNST HANS HELLMUT) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]US2972275  (BAUBLES RICHARD C) [A] 1-3 * column W *