Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0668495

EP0668495 - Measuring installation for the exhaust particles (soot) of combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pierburg Aktiengesellschaft
Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1
41460 Neuss / DE
[1996/30]
Former [1995/34]For all designated states
PIERBURG GMBH
Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1
D-41460 Neuss / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dickow, Achim
Klippe 63
D-42555 Velbert / DE
[1995/34]
Application number, filing date95101524.704.02.1995
[1995/34]
Priority number, dateDE1994440494717.02.1994         Original published format: DE 4404947
[1995/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0668495
Date:23.08.1995
Language:DE
[1995/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0668495
Date:16.09.1998
[1998/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0668495
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01M15/00
[1995/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1995/34]
TitleGerman:Messanlage für Brennkraftmaschinen-Abgaspartikel (Russ)[1995/34]
English:Measuring installation for the exhaust particles (soot) of combustion engines[1995/34]
French:Installation de mesure des particules d'échappement (suie) des moteurs à combustion[1995/34]
Examination procedure04.02.1995Examination requested  [1995/34]
01.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.12.1999Fee for grant paid
24.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
19.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
24.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4017473  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *