EP0667713 - Method and apparatus for recording and reproducing compressed video data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishimura, Tatsuya Nishigawara 105-1, Kakogawa-cho Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo-ken 675 / JP | 02 /
Masuno, Wataru 5-22, Mido-cho Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571 / JP | 03 /
Ogawa, Hideaki 7-3, Iwakura Hanazono-cho, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu 606 / JP | 04 /
Yoneyama, Akira 3-7-32, Syuntoku-cho Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka-fu 577 / JP | 05 /
Murata, Tatsuya Shimokosaka 2-3-21 Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka-fu 577 / JP | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95101825.8 | 10.02.1995 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | JP19940017165 | 14.02.1994 Original published format: JP 1716594 | [1995/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0667713 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0667713 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667713 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/926 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
G06T9/004 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B27/3036 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
H04N9/806 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/65 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
H04N5/7805 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N5/783 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufzeichnen und Wiedergeben von komprimierten Videodaten | [1995/33] | English: | Method and apparatus for recording and reproducing compressed video data | [1995/33] | French: | Méthode et dispositif d'enregistrement et de reproduction de données vidéo comprimées | [1995/33] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/33] | 13.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9407332 (SONY CORP [JP]) [PX] 1,2,4-6,8-10,12,13,15 * abstract * * page 29, line 4 - page 32, line 20 * * page 37, line 10 - page 40, line 4 * |