Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0668059

EP0668059 - Implant for treating fractures of the femur [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Collux AB
Kyrkogatan 6
239 40 Falsterbo / SE
[1999/35]
Former [1995/34]For all designated states
Collux AB
Bronsaldersgatan 3
S-213 76 Malmö / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Tellman, Lars
Kyrkogatan 6
S-230 11 Falsterbo / SE
02 / Lagerman, Pehr
Karlavägen 72
S-114 59 Stockholm / SE
03 / Hansson, Henrik
Konsistoriegatan 6
S-582 22 Linköping / SE
[1995/34]
Representative(s)Magnusson, Gustav
L.A. Groth & Co. Box 6153
200 11 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [1995/34]Magnusson, Gustav
MAGNUPATENT AB P.O. Box 6207
S-200 11 Malmö 6 / SE
Application number, filing date95102136.916.02.1995
[1995/34]
Priority number, dateSE1994000060921.02.1994         Original published format: SE 9400609
SE1994000105729.03.1994         Original published format: SE 9401057
[1995/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0668059
Date:23.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0668059
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.06.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/76
[1995/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/34]
TitleGerman:Implantat für die Behandlung von Frakturen des Femur[1995/34]
English:Implant for treating fractures of the femur[1995/34]
French:Implant pour le traitement des fractures du fémur[1995/34]
Examination procedure06.09.1995Examination requested  [1995/45]
05.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.1999Fee for grant paid
28.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
04.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
IE16.02.2000
LU16.02.2000
MC05.03.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2004/07]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
IE16.02.2000
MC05.03.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2003/45]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
IE16.02.2000
MC05.03.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2002/42]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
IE16.02.2000
MC05.03.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2001/17]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
IE16.02.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2001/09]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2001/08]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]US4628923  (MEDOFF ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1-3,13-15;
 [A]US4795473  (GRIMES JAMES B [US]) [A] 1;
 [A]US5041114  (CHAPMAN MICHAEL W [US], et al) [A] 1-5,13