Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0670333

EP0670333 - Watersoluble crosslinked polymer dispersions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 05.11.2003  [2003/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Röhm GmbH
Kirschenallee
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[2000/04]
Former [1995/36]For all designated states
RÖHM GMBH
Kirschenallee
D-64293 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Carl, Joachim, Dr.
Falltorstrasse 8
D-64291 Darmstadt / DE
02 / Quis, Peter, Dr.
Pfannmüllerweg 26
D-64289 Darmstadt / DE
03 / Braum, Manfred
Wallstrasse 22
D-55122 Mainz / DE
04 / Desch, Wolfram
Kastanienweg 49
D-64331 Weiterstadt / DE
[1995/36]
Application number, filing date95102397.721.02.1995
[1995/36]
Priority number, dateDE1994440662401.03.1994         Original published format: DE 4406624
[1995/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0670333
Date:06.09.1995
Language:DE
[1995/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0670333
Date:06.12.1995
Language:DE
[1995/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0670333
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Former [1995/39]Type: A3  Search report
No.:EP0670333
Date:
Status:(deleted)
[1995/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP18.10.1995
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/10, C08F220/04, C02F1/54
[1995/49]
Former International [1995/36]C08F2/10, C08F20/04, C02F1/54
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1995/36]
TitleGerman:Vernetzte wasserlösliche Polymerdispersionen[1995/36]
English:Watersoluble crosslinked polymer dispersions[1995/36]
French:Dispersions de polymères réticulés solubles à l'eau[1995/36]
Examination procedure22.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/25]
30.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.1999Fee for grant paid
15.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
19.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE26.01.2000
DK26.04.2000
[2003/45]
Former [2002/23]SE26.01.2000
Documents cited:Search[DE]WO9511269  (ROEHM GMBH [DE], et al) [DE] 1,2,4-12 * claims 1-9 *;
 DE4335567  [ ] (ROEHM GMBH [DE]);
 [DPX]EP0624617  (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [DPX] 1,2,4-12 * claims 1-8 *;
 DE4316200  [ ] (ROEHM GMBH [DE]);
 [DA]EP0573793  (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,2,4-9,12 * claims 1-8 *;
 [DA]DE2924663  (SHOWA DENKO KK) [DA] 1,2,4-9,12;
 [A]EP0271077  (HOECHST AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-9,12 * page 8, line 23 - line 29 *