Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0674128
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
02.03.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] |
09.03.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.04.2001 [2001/17] |
31.01.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.01.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.10.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
13.10.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.10.2000 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.11.2000 [2000/48] |
30.05.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
26.05.2000 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] |
26.05.2000 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] |
26.05.2000 |
Change - German title |
published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] |
02.02.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.01.2000 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] |
28.01.2000 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] |
28.01.2000 |
Change - German title |
published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] |
24.11.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.07.1999 |
First examination report |
|
26.07.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.02.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.04.1998 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
03.04.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.04.1998 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
21.11.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] |
25.03.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.03.1997 |
Publication of search report |
published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] |
11.08.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] |