Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0674128

EP0674128 - Backflow preventing combination for vehicle fuel tanks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/39]Backflow preventing valve for vehicle fuel tanks
[2000/11]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.04.2002  [2002/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ERSI ITALIA S.p.A.
Via Stura 1/3
10071 Borgaro Torinese (Torino) / IT
[2001/17]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
ERSI ITALIA S.p.A.
Via Stura 1/3
10122 Torino / IT
Former [1995/39]For all designated states
ERSI ITALIA S.p.A.
Via del Carmine, 29
I-10122 Torino / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Lobascio, Osvaldo
Via Don Bosco, 27
I-10144 Torino / IT
02 / Rocca, Andrea
Strada San Felice, 76/21
I-10025 Pino Torinese / IT
[1995/39]
Representative(s)Saconney, Piero , et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27
10152 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [1995/39]Saconney, Piero , et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27
I-10152 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date95102631.924.02.1995
[1995/39]
Priority number, dateIT1994TO0013328.02.1994         Original published format: IT TO940133
[1995/39]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0674128
Date:27.09.1995
Language:EN
[1995/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0674128
Date:23.04.1997
[1997/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0674128
Date:25.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:F16K15/02, B60K15/035
[1995/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/39]
TitleGerman:Rückflussverhinderungskombination für einen KFZ-Kraftstoffbehälter[2000/11]
English:Backflow preventing combination for vehicle fuel tanks[2000/11]
French:Dispositif anti-retour pour réservoirs de véhicules automobiles[2000/11]
Former [1995/39]Rückflussverhinderer eines KFZ-Kraftstoffbehälters
Former [1995/39]Backflow preventing valve for vehicle fuel tanks
Former [1995/39]Clapet de retenue d'un réservoir de carburant pour véhicules automobiles
Examination procedure14.10.1997Examination requested  [1998/02]
28.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2001Fee for grant paid
17.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
19.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
19.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.03.199703   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.1997
28.02.199804   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.1998
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5282497  (ALLISON ALLEN [US]) [Y] 1,2 * column 6, line 20 - line 57; figures 1,6 *;
 [Y]US2554053  (HYER CHARLES H) [Y] 1,2 * column W *;
 [A]GB983076  (NEUMO LTD) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 17 - line 119; figure - *;
 [A]US4643222  (WISER DAVID [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 10 - line 40; figure 1 *
ExaminationUS5044389