Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0672355

EP0672355 - Method and apparatus for transporting filter rods [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2001
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 20.03.2002  [2002/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hauni Maschinenbau AG
Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32
21033 Hamburg / DE
[1999/17]
Former [1995/46]For all designated states
Hauni Maschinenbau Aktiengesellschaft
Kampchaussee 8-32
D-21033 Hamburg / DE
Former [1995/38]For all designated states
KÖRBER AG
Kampchaussee 8-32
D-21033 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bostelmann, Rudolf
Stellinger Stieg 6
D-21502 Geesthacht / DE
02 / Buhk, Birger
Curslacker Heerweg 68
D-21039 Hamburg / DE
03 / Burmester-Perrei, Jan
Heymannstrasse 20
D-20253 Hamburg / DE
04 / Schmidt, Hans-Herbert
Erich-Ziegel-Ring 37
D-22039 Hamburg / DE
05 / Petersen, Rolf
Hauptstrasse 11
D-21483 Gülzow / DE
[1995/38]
Application number, filing date95102810.928.02.1995
[1995/38]
Priority number, dateDE1994440849414.03.1994         Original published format: DE 4408494
[1995/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0672355
Date:20.09.1995
Language:DE
[1995/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0672355
Date:06.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.1995
ClassificationInternational:A24C5/32, A24C5/31
[1995/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1995/38]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Fördern von Filterstäben[1995/38]
English:Method and apparatus for transporting filter rods[1995/38]
French:Procédé et dispositif de transport de tiges de filtre[1995/38]
Examination procedure23.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/17]
21.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
25.02.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
16.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2000Fee for grant paid
07.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE06.12.2000
BE28.02.2001
[2002/12]
Former [2001/27]SE06.12.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2068325  (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG) [A] 1,7 * page 9, line 35 - page 9, line 81; figure 3 *;
 [A]FR1405903  (MOLINS MACHINE CO LTD) [A] 1,7 * page 5, column L, line 11 - page 6, column L, line 8; figures 4-8 *;
 [A]GB2070545  (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG) [A] 1,7 * page 4, line 58 - line 83; figure 1 *;
 [PA]EP0635220  (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [PA] 1,7 * the whole document *;
 [E]EP0640296  (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [E] 1,7 * the whole document *