Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0675491

EP0675491 - Control unit of disk apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.09.2001 [2001/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP
Former [1995/40]For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kodama, Koji
153-6, Anabe
Odawara-shi / JP
[1995/40]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/40]Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date95104309.023.03.1995
[1995/40]
Priority number, dateJP1994005743628.03.1994         Original published format: JP 5743694
[1995/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0675491
Date:04.10.1995
Language:EN
[1995/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0675491
Date:25.10.1995
Language:EN
[1995/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0675491
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:G11B5/55, G11B21/08, G11B19/02
[1995/43]
Former International [1995/40]G11B19/02, G11B21/08, G11B5/55
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/40]
TitleGerman:Plattengerät-Steuerungseinheit[1995/40]
English:Control unit of disk apparatus[1995/40]
French:Unité de commande d'appareil à disque[1995/40]
Examination procedure13.09.1995Examination requested  [1995/45]
04.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2000Fee for grant paid
06.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH05210925  ;
 [Y]JPS6341970  ;
 [A]JPS63205756  ;
 [A]JPH0341684  ;
 [A]JPH01286179  ;
 [XP]EP0600497  (NEC CORP [JP]) [XP] 1,4,6 * column 1, line 44 - column 4, line 12 * * column 8, line 36 - column 11, line 12 * * column 18, line 27 - line 39 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [XP]EP0601894  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 36 * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 49 * * figure 1; claim 1 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931202), vol. 017, no. 650, Database accession no. (P - 1652), [Y] 1-6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880716), vol. 012, no. 253, Database accession no. (P - 731), [Y] 1-6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881223), vol. 012, no. 494, Database accession no. (P - 805), [A] 1,3-6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910513), vol. 015, no. 184, Database accession no. (P - 1200), [A] 1,4,6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900206), vol. 014, no. 064, Database accession no. (P - 1002), [A] 1,4 * abstract *
 [A]  - YAGER C, "Trim head-positioning overhead with embedded disk servo", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, 25 AUG. 1988, USA, ISSN 0013-4872, vol. 36, no. 19, pages 83 - 90, XP000001314