blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0675106

EP0675106 - A process for the preparation of alkane sulfonic acid and alkane sulfonyl chloride [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC.
2000 Market Street Philadelphia
Pennsylvania 19103-3222 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/16]For all designated states
ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC.
2000 Market Street
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19103-3222 / US
Former [1995/40]For all designated states
ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC.
2000 Market Street
Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102-3222 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Schon, Steven Gabriel, Chem. Eng.
454 Saunders Drive
Strafford, PA 19087 / US
[1995/40]
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas, et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Albrecht, Thomas, et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2003/47]Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al
Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [1995/40]Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
D-80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date95104522.828.03.1995
[1995/40]
Priority number, dateUS1994022122431.03.1994         Original published format: US 221224
[1995/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0675106
Date:04.10.1995
Language:EN
[1995/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0675106
Date:18.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.1995
ClassificationIPC:C07C303/16, C07C309/04, C07C309/80
[1995/40]
CPC:
C07C303/16 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C07C303/16, C07C309/04 (EP,US);
C07C303/16, C07C309/80 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/40]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alkansulfonsäuren und Alkansulfonylchloriden[1995/40]
English:A process for the preparation of alkane sulfonic acid and alkane sulfonyl chloride[1995/40]
French:Procédé de préparation d'acides d'alcane-sulfoniques et de chlorures d'alcane-sulfonyles[1995/40]
Examination procedure19.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/33]
14.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.08.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.05.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.1998Fee for grant paid
03.08.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.08.1999    ADMISSIBLE
Phillips Petroleum Company
Bartlesville, Oklahoma 74004 / US
Opponent's representative
Ricker, Mathias
Bardehle Pagenberg
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1999/41]
Opponent(s)01  18.08.1999    ADMISSIBLE
Phillips Petroleum Company
Bartlesville, Oklahoma 74004 / US
Opponent's representative
Ricker, Mathias, Dr.Dipl.-Chem.
Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg- Geissler & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
23.09.1999Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.01.2000Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.11.2000Date of oral proceedings
13.12.2000Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
18.04.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
28.04.2005Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/37]
Appeal following opposition08.02.2001Appeal received No.  T0177/01
19.04.2001Statement of grounds filed
11.09.2003Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
11.09.2003Date of oral proceedings
30.09.2003Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
29.05.1996M01   Fee paid on   19.06.1996
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.11.1998
BE18.11.1998
CH18.11.1998
GR18.11.1998
IT18.11.1998
LI18.11.1998
NL18.11.1998
SE18.11.1998
DK18.02.1999
PT18.02.1999
DE19.02.1999
GB28.03.1999
IE28.03.1999
LU28.03.1999
ES19.05.1999
MC30.09.1999
[2008/05]
Former [2004/39]AT18.11.1998
BE18.11.1998
CH18.11.1998
GR18.11.1998
LI18.11.1998
NL18.11.1998
SE18.11.1998
DK18.02.1999
PT18.02.1999
DE19.02.1999
GB28.03.1999
IE28.03.1999
LU28.03.1999
ES19.05.1999
MC30.09.1999
Former [2004/04]AT18.11.1998
BE18.11.1998
CH18.11.1998
GR18.11.1998
LI18.11.1998
NL18.11.1998
SE18.11.1998
DK18.02.1999
PT18.02.1999
DE19.02.1999
GB28.03.1999
IE28.03.1999
ES19.05.1999
MC30.09.1999
Former [2003/45]AT18.11.1998
BE18.11.1998
CH18.11.1998
GR18.11.1998
LI18.11.1998
NL18.11.1998
SE18.11.1998
DK18.02.1999
PT18.02.1999
DE19.02.1999
GB28.03.1999
IE28.03.1999
MC30.09.1999
Former [2003/18]AT18.11.1998
BE18.11.1998
CH18.11.1998
GR18.11.1998
LI18.11.1998
NL18.11.1998
SE18.11.1998
PT18.02.1999
DE19.02.1999
GB28.03.1999
IE28.03.1999
MC30.09.1999
Former [2003/17]AT18.11.1998
BE18.11.1998
CH18.11.1998
GR18.11.1998
LI18.11.1998
NL18.11.1998
SE18.11.1998
PT18.02.1999
DE19.02.1999
GB28.03.1999
IE28.03.1999
MC31.03.1999
Former [2003/13]AT18.11.1998
BE18.11.1998
CH18.11.1998
GR18.11.1998
LI18.11.1998
NL18.11.1998
SE18.11.1998
PT18.02.1999
DE19.02.1999
GB28.03.1999
IE28.03.1999
MC30.09.1999
Former [2003/08]AT18.11.1998
BE18.11.1998
CH18.11.1998
GR18.11.1998
LI18.11.1998
NL18.11.1998
PT18.02.1999
DE19.02.1999
GB28.03.1999
IE28.03.1999
MC30.09.1999
Former [2001/23]AT18.11.1998
BE18.11.1998
CH18.11.1998
GR18.11.1998
LI18.11.1998
PT18.02.1999
DE19.02.1999
GB28.03.1999
IE28.03.1999
MC30.09.1999
Former [2001/05]AT18.11.1998
BE18.11.1998
CH18.11.1998
LI18.11.1998
PT18.02.1999
DE19.02.1999
GB28.03.1999
IE28.03.1999
MC30.09.1999
Former [2000/52]AT18.11.1998
BE18.11.1998
CH18.11.1998
LI18.11.1998
PT18.02.1999
DE19.02.1999
IE28.03.1999
MC30.09.1999
Former [2000/50]AT18.11.1998
BE18.11.1998
PT18.02.1999
DE19.02.1999
CH23.02.1999
LI23.02.1999
IE28.03.1999
MC30.09.1999
Former [2000/27]AT18.11.1998
BE18.11.1998
PT18.02.1999
DE19.02.1999
IE28.03.1999
MC30.09.1999
Former [2000/25]AT18.11.1998
BE18.11.1998
PT18.02.1999
DE19.02.1999
MC30.09.1999
Former [1999/34]AT18.11.1998
BE18.11.1998
PT18.02.1999
DE19.02.1999
Former [1999/32]BE18.11.1998
PT18.02.1999
DE19.02.1999
Former [1999/30]DE19.02.1999
Documents cited:Search[A]US3562323  (SUZUKI SHIGETO) [A] 1;
 [DA]US3600136  (GIOLITO SILVIO L, et al) [DA] 1,8,16;
 [DA]US3626004  (GUERTIN ROLAND MAURICE) [DA] 1,8,9,16;
 [DA]GB1350328  (PENNWALT CORP) [DA] 1,4,5;
 [DA]US3993692  (GIOLITO SILVIO L, et al) [DA] 1,8,16;
 [A]EP0010162  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1;
 [A]EP0040560  (ELF AQUITAINE [FR]) [A] 1,4,8,9,12,16;
 [A]EP0319767  (BAYER AG [DE])[A] 1
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.