blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0691533

EP0691533 - Pressure sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.04.2003  [2003/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujikoki Corporation
17-24, Todoroki 7-chome, Setagaya-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
Fujikoki Corporation
17-24, Todoroki 7-chome, Setagaya-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1996/02]For all designated states
Fujikoki Mfg. Co., Ltd.
1-7-15, Kamimeguro, Meguro-ku
Tokyo 153 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sasaki, Keiji
1-5522-15 Hibarigaoka
Zama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 228 / JP
02 / Koguchi, Masayuki
4-5-6 Minami Rinkan
Yamato-shi, Kanagawa-ken 242 / JP
[1996/02]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido, et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/02]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
D-80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date95104738.030.03.1995
[1996/02]
Priority number, dateJP1994015716008.07.1994         Original published format: JP 15716094
[1996/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0691533
Date:10.01.1996
Language:EN
[1996/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0691533
Date:28.07.1999
[1999/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.1999
ClassificationIPC:G01L9/04, G01L9/00, G01L19/14
[1999/30]
CPC:
G01L9/0051 (EP,US); G01L19/14 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1996/02]G01L9/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/02]
TitleGerman:Druckwandler[1996/02]
English:Pressure sensor[1996/02]
French:Capteur de pression[1996/02]
Examination procedure03.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/23]
14.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/14]
29.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
19.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3247719  (HERBERT CHELNER) [A] 1 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 45; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4993267  (ALLARD JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 32 - column 6, line 40; figures 3-10 *;
 [A]US5159525  (TATE KIKUO [JP]) [A] 2,3 * column 6, line 58 - column 8, line 54; figures 4-6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.