Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0681994

EP0681994 - Germ barrier for a sieve filter in a household water filter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 05.11.2003  [2003/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Judo Wasseraufbereitung GmbH
Hohreuschstrasse 39-41
D-71364 Winnenden / DE
[1995/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Söcknick, Ralf, Dr.
Blücherstrasse 11
70806 Kornwestheim / DE
[1995/46]
Representative(s)Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/46]KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
D-70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date95105159.806.04.1995
[1995/46]
Priority number, dateDE1994441650110.05.1994         Original published format: DE 4416501
[1995/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0681994
Date:15.11.1995
Language:DE
[1995/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0681994
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/50, B01D39/08, B01D39/12, B01D39/10
[1995/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DK,   FR,   IT,   LI [1999/34]
Former [1995/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  FR,  IT,  LI 
TitleGerman:Keimschutz für Hauswasserfilter-Siebeinsätze[1995/46]
English:Germ barrier for a sieve filter in a household water filter[1995/46]
French:Barrière à germe pour un filtre à tamis d'un filtre à eau pour usage domestique[1995/46]
Examination procedure16.03.1996Examination requested  [1996/20]
17.05.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.08.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.1999Fee for grant paid
04.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK26.04.2000
[2003/45]
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH04145910  ;
 [Y]DE3905164  (BIOLIT FILTERTECHNIK UND SERVI [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * column 1, line 23 - line 26 *;
 [Y]DE2258906  (RECH DES ETATS DE SURFACE CENT) [Y] 1-3 * page 12; example - *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920907), vol. 016, no. 425, Database accession no. (C - 0982), [X] 1-3 * abstract *