Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0681030

EP0681030 - Use of phosphonium compounds in the production of leather [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.10.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rhodia Consumer Specialties Limited
P.O. Box 3, 210-222 Hagley Road West Oldbury
West Midlands B68 0NN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
Rhodia Consumer Specialties Limited
P.O. Box 3, 210-222 Hagley Road West
Oldbury, West Midlands B68 0NN / GB
Former [1995/45]For all designated states
ALBRIGHT & WILSON UK LIMITED
P.O. Box 3, 210-222 Hagley Road West
Oldbury, Warley, West Midlands B68 0NN / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Matthews, Nigel Stephen
105 Shrubbery Road, Drakes Broughton
Pershore, Worcestershire WR10 2BE / GB
02 / Lloyd, Graham Robert
5 Telford Gardens
Brewood, Staffordshire ST19 9ED / GB
[1995/45]
Representative(s)Savidge, Roger Gordon Madgwick , et al
Rhodia Consumer Specialities Limited Patents Department P O Box 3 210-222 Hagley Road West
Oldbury, Warley, West Midlands B68 0NN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Savidge, Roger Gordon Madgwick , et al
Rhodia Consumer Specialities Limited Patents Department P O Box 3 210-222 Hagley Road West
Oldbury, Warley, West Midlands B68 0NN / GB
Former [1995/45]Savidge, Roger Gordon Madgwick , et al
ALBRIGHT & WILSON UK LIMITED Patents Department P O Box 3 210-222 Hagley Road West
Oldbury, Warley, West Midlands B68 0NN / GB
Application number, filing date95105162.225.09.1992
[1995/45]
Priority number, dateGB1991002065227.09.1991         Original published format: GB 9120652
[1995/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0681030
Date:08.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0681030
Date:01.05.1996
[1996/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0681030
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:C14C11/00
[1995/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   SE [1995/45]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Phosphonium-Verbindungen in der Lederherstellung[1995/45]
English:Use of phosphonium compounds in the production of leather[1995/45]
French:Utilisation de composés à fonction phosphonium dans la fabrication du cuir[1995/45]
Examination procedure06.04.1995Examination requested  [1995/45]
18.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.04.2000Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
11.05.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2000Fee for grant paid
21.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP92920167.1  / EP0559867
Opposition(s)30.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/47]
Request for further processing for:25.04.2000Request for further processing filed
25.04.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.05.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
04.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
28.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
24.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
06.04.199503   M06   Fee paid on   21.09.1995
Former [2002/14]DE01.03.2001
Documents cited:Search[A]GB764312  (BRADFORD DYERS ASS LTD, et al) [A] * page 2, lines 13-27 * * page 1, line 32 * * page 1, line 52; example 4 *;
 [A]EP0122894  (FMC CORP [US]) [A] * page 5, lines 6-26 *