Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0680761

EP0680761 - Topical medicament having cicatrizing activity [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.12.2002  [2002/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INDENA S.p.A.
Via Ripamonti, 99
20141 Milano / IT
[2001/51]
Former [1995/45]For all designated states
INDENA S.p.A.
Via Ripamonti, 99
I-20141 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Bombardelli, Ezio
Via Ripamonti, 99
I-20141 Milano / IT
02 / Guglielmini, Giancarlo
Via Ripamonti, 99
I-20141 Milano / IT
03 / Morazzoni, Paolo
Via Ripamonti, 99
I-20141 Milano / IT
04 / Curri, Sergio
Via Cagliero, 17
I-20125 Milano / IT
05 / Polinelli, Walter
Piazza C. Donegani, 4
I-20133 Milano / IT
[1995/45]
Representative(s)Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1995/45]Minoja, Fabrizio
Studio Consulenza Brevettuale, Via Rossini, 8
I-20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date95105944.320.04.1995
[1995/45]
Priority number, dateIT1994MI0088406.05.1994         Original published format: IT MI940884
[1995/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0680761
Date:08.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0680761
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.08.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/78, A61K31/40, A61K31/20, A61K31/48
[1995/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1995/45]
TitleGerman:Topisches Arzneimittel mit vernarbungsfördernder Wirkung[1995/45]
English:Topical medicament having cicatrizing activity[1995/45]
French:Médicament topique ayant une activité cicatrisante[1995/45]
Examination procedure23.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/25]
17.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
05.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
13.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
27.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2001Fee for grant paid
12.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
20.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0442063  (NATTERMANN A & CIE [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * claims 1-8 *;
 [DX]EP0418806  (INDENA SPA [IT]) [DX] 1-9 * claims 1-7 * * page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 7 * * page 7, line 44 - line 46 *;
 [X]EP0369105  (BERTINI CURRI SERGIO [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * claims 1-9 *;
 [DX]EP0304603  (INDENA SPA [IT]) [DX] 1-9 * claims 1-10 *;
 [X]EP0573260  (INDENA SPA [IT]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * claims 1-20 * * page 6; examples VII-VIII *