blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0678985 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0678985



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 194
04.01.2007 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.01.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.11.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.11.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
28.11.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
05.09.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
05.09.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
05.09.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 44
10.05.2004 Description Search / examination 4
10.05.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.05.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
23.01.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
23.01.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.08.2003 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.08.2003 General enquiry Search / examination 1
24.02.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.08.1997 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
02.06.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.06.1997 European search report Search / examination 2
08.05.1995 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
08.05.1995 Priority document Search / examination 50
22.04.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.04.1995 Claims Search / examination 8
22.04.1995 Description Search / examination 25
22.04.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.1995 Drawings Search / examination 13
22.04.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6