blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0678985


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.01.2007 No opposition filed within time limit published on  07.02.2007  [2007/06]
13.01.2006 (Expected) grant published on  01.03.2006  [2006/09]
05.12.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
05.12.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
27.08.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.04.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.05.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
30.04.2004 Change - divisional application(s) published on  16.06.2004  [2004/25]
26.04.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.03.2004 Change - classification published on  12.05.2004  [2004/20]
26.03.2004 Change - classification published on  12.05.2004  [2004/20]
24.01.2004 First examination report
21.01.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.04.2003 Renewal fee
27.04.2002 Renewal fee
25.04.2001 Renewal fee
25.04.2000 Renewal fee
22.04.1999 Renewal fee
23.04.1998 Renewal fee
05.09.1997 Request for examination filed published on  22.10.1997 [1997/43]
06.06.1997 Publication of search report published on  23.07.1997 [1997/30]
16.05.1997 Change - classification published on  02.07.1997 [1997/27]
22.04.1997 Renewal fee
08.09.1995 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.10.1995 [1995/43]