blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0678985

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
Examination procedure28.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 11
European patent granted01.03.2006
Opposition procedure04.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit published on 07.02.2007 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:25.10.1995 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:23.07.1997 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:22.10.1997 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19970822
 
Event date:10.03.2004 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20040123
 
Event date:12.05.2004 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7H 03K 19/173 A
 
Event date:01.03.2006 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:01.03.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:27.04.2006 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69534812
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20060427
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:04.08.2006 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:07.02.2007 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20061204
 
Event date:09.01.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 69534812 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:KOTITSCHKE & HEURUNG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENT-, DE
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20140428
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20140429
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20140417
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:23.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69534812 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:13.05.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20150421
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20150421