Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0678985

EP0678985 - A programmable logic device which stores more than one configuration and means for switching configurations [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2007
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.02.2007  [2007/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xilinx, Inc.
2100 Logic Drive
San Jose, California 95124-3400 / US
[2006/09]
Former [1995/43]For all designated states
Xilinx, Inc.
2100 Logic Drive
San Jose, California 95124 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ong, Randy T.
22044 Baxley Court
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
[1995/43]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/43]W.P. THOMPSON & CO.
Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn
London WC1V 7HU / GB
Application number, filing date95106039.122.04.1995
[1995/43]
Priority number, dateUS1994023100920.04.1994         Original published format: US 231009
[1995/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0678985
Date:25.10.1995
Language:EN
[1995/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0678985
Date:23.07.1997
[1997/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0678985
Date:01.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:H03K19/173
[2004/20]
Former International [1997/27]H03K19/177, H03K19/173
Former International [1995/43]H03K19/177
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/43]
TitleGerman:Programmierbare logische Vorrichtung, die mehr als eine Konfiguration speichert, und Mittel zum Umschalten der Konfigurationen[1995/43]
English:A programmable logic device which stores more than one configuration and means for switching configurations[1995/43]
French:Dispositif logique programmable qui mémorise plus d'une configuration et un moyen pour commuter des configurations[1995/43]
Examination procedure22.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/43]
23.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2005Fee for grant paid
28.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04009807.1  / EP1455455
Opposition(s)04.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0415542  (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1,2,8-10,12,13,20,29 * page 8, line 23 - page 9, line 39; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0486991  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 1,2,8,9,12,13,20,29 * column 3, line 21 - column 7, line 3 * * column 8, line 2 - column 9, line 24; figures 1,2,4,5 *;
 [A]EP0581409  (XILINX INC [US]) [A] 1,2,8,9,29 * page 2, line 25 - page 4, line 27 * * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 3; figures 1-3,10A,10B *;
 [A]US5122685  (CHAN ANDREW K [US], et al) [A] 1,2,20,29 * column 4, line 36 - column 8, line 32; figures 1,2,5; table 1 *;
 [E]US5430687  (HUNG LAWRENCE C [US], et al) [E] 1,2,8,9,12,13,20,29 * column 4, line 23 - column 6, line 20 * * column 8, line 33 - column 11, line 17; figures 1,2,2A,4,4A *