blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0680922

EP0680922 - Device for charging of mine cages in mining [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.05.2000
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip29.12.2000Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 14.02.2001 [2001/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMAG TRANSPLAN GMBH
Obere Industriestrasse 8
57250 Netphen / DE
[1999/30]
Former [1995/45]For all designated states
SIEMAG TRANSPLAN GMBH
Obere Industriestrasse 8
D-57250 Netphen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Simmich, Klaus
Hömbergstr. 24
D-57250 Netphen / DE
02 / Mohr, Edgar
Austrasse 32
D-57548 Kirchen / DE
[1995/45]
Representative(s)Müller, Gerd
Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2
57072 Siegen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/45]Müller, Gerd
Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2
D-57072 Siegen / DE
Application number, filing date95106299.127.04.1995
[1995/45]
Priority number, dateDE1994441602006.05.1994         Original published format: DE 4416020
[1995/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0680922
Date:08.11.1995
Language:DE
[1995/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0680922
Date:28.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.1995
ClassificationIPC:B66B17/20, B61J3/00
[1995/45]
CPC:
B61J3/00 (EP); B66B17/20 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   LI,   SE [1995/45]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Beschickung von Förderkörben im Bergbau[1995/45]
English:Device for charging of mine cages in mining[1995/45]
French:Dispositif pour le chargement des cages d'extractions dans le domaine minier[1995/45]
Examination procedure12.05.1995Examination requested  [1995/45]
22.09.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.01.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.04.1999Fee for grant paid
22.04.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.04.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
16.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB28.07.1999
[2001/07]
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3707169  (HAUHINCO MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 29; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE3022710  (RUHRKOHLE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 20; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.