EP0684471 - Total organic carbon meter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shimadzu Corporation 1 Kuwabara-cho Nishinokyo Nakakyo-ku Kyoto 604 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/48] | For all designated states SHIMADZU CORPORATION 1 Kuwabara-cho Nishinokyo Nakakyo-ku Kyoto 604 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Minako c/o Shimadzu Corporation, 1, Kuwabara-cho Nishinokyo Nakagyo-ku, Kyoto 604 / JP | 02 /
Morita, Youzo c/o Shimadzu Corporation, 1, Kuwabara-cho Nishinokyo Nakagyo-ku, Kyoto 604 / JP | [1995/48] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Georg-Kalb-Strasse 9 82049 Pullach / DE | ||
Former [1995/48] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Georg-Kalb-Strasse 9 D-82049 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95106814.7 | 05.05.1995 | [1995/48] | Priority number, date | JP19940138038 | 27.05.1994 Original published format: JP 13803894 | [1995/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0684471 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0684471 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | [2001/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0684471 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/18 | [1995/48] | CPC: |
G01N33/1846 (EP,US);
Y10T436/23 (EP,US);
Y10T436/235 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Messen des Gesamtgehaltes an organischem Kohlenstoff | [2001/28] | English: | Total organic carbon meter | [1995/48] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de la teneur totale en carbone organique | [1995/48] |
Former [1995/48] | Vorrichtung zum Messen der Gesamtgehaltes an organischem Kohlenstoff | Examination procedure | 21.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 27.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9317333 (FLUID DYNAMICS SALES LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-7 * page 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 9, paragraph 6 - page 10, paragraph 3 *; | [Y]US5271900 (MORITA YOUZO [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 6 * * column 2, line 53 - line 62 * * column 3, line 2 - line 52 * * column 4, line 60 - line 67 *; | [A]DE4224077 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3,5-7 * column 3, line 29 - line 41 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 14 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 12 *; | [A]JPS59120954 ; | [A]JPH0331761 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841114), vol. 008, no. 248, Database accession no. (P - 313), & JP59120954 A 19840712 (NIPPON DENKI KK) [A] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910425), vol. 015, no. 166, Database accession no. (P - 1195), & JP03031761 A 19910212 (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |