Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0744223

EP0744223 - Device for sorting solid objects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAGOTTEAUX INTERNATIONAL S.A.
Rue A. Dumont
4051 Vaux-sous-Chèvremont / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
MAGOTTEAUX INTERNATIONAL S.A.
Rue A. Dumont
B-4051 Vaux-sous-Chèvremont / BE
Former [1996/48]For all designated states
MAGOTTEAUX INTERNATIONAL Société Anonyme dite :
Rue A. Dumont
B-4051 Vaux-sous-Chèvremont / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Uwa, Marian
Am Welde 2
D-25569 Kremperheide / DE
[1996/48]
Representative(s)Meyers, Ernest , et al
pronovem - MEYERS & VAN MALDEREN 261 route d'Arlon
8011 Strassen / LU
[N/P]
Former [1996/48]Meyers, Ernest , et al
Office de Brevets Meyers & Van Malderen 261 route d'Arlon B.P. 111
8002 Strassen / LU
Application number, filing date95106834.505.05.1995
[1996/48]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0744223
Date:27.11.1996
Language:FR
[1996/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0744223
Date:19.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.1995
ClassificationInternational:B07B1/18, B07B1/22
[1996/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PT [1997/09]
Former [1996/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesLTNot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Sortierung von festen Gegenständen[1996/48]
English:Device for sorting solid objects[1996/48]
French:Machine de triage d'objets solides[1996/48]
Examination procedure07.05.1996Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
06.09.1996Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, DK, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE
05.03.1997Examination requested  [1997/21]
05.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
31.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
13.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.1999Fee for grant paid
23.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.06.1996CH   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.1996DK   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.1996GR   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.1996IE   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.1996LI   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.1996LU   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.1996MC   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.1996NL   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.1996SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE690571  (RENE GENEL) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - line 19 *;
 [A]US1617688  (EDWARD O'TOOLE) [A] 1 * page 1, line 69 - line 111 * * figure - *;
 [A]GB2089685  (ASSOCIATED PERFORATORS & WEAVE) [A] 1 * page 1, line 28 - line 34 * * page 1, line 59 - line 62 * * page 1, line 110 - line 126 * * figure 2 *;
 [AD]FR2248884  (LAFARGE SA [FR]) [AD] 1,9 * page 2, line 3 - line 32 * * page 3, line 29 - line 32 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]FR430562  (WILLIAM HENRY BAXTER [GB]) [A] 1,4,7 * page 3, line 4 - line 30 * * page 3, line 74 - line 81 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]FR393731  (PAUL BAUR [CH]) [A] 5 * the whole document *